Seek Stock Nz Limited was started on 08 May 2015 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429041736463. The registered LTD company has been run by 1 director, named Andrea Maria Van Der Meel - an active director whose contract began on 08 May 2015.
According to our data (last updated on 10 Sep 2024), this company uses 1 address: 174 Clyde Street, Island Bay, Wellington, 6023 (type: registered, service).
Up to 17 Oct 2018, Seek Stock Nz Limited had been using 10 Collins Street, Morningside, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 10000 shares are allotted to 3 groups (3 shareholders in total). In the first group, 500 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Wills, Adrian (an individual) located at Te Atatu South, Auckland postcode 0602.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 6% shares (exactly 600 shares) and includes
Lightning Lab Auckland 2016 Lp - located at Eden Terrace, Auckland.
The next share allocation (8900 shares, 89%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Van Der Meel, Andrea Maria, located at Mount Eden, Auckland (a director). Seek Stock Nz Limited was classified as "Software development service nec" (business classification M700050).
Principal place of activity
Suite 2, 221 Symonds Street, Eden Terrace, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 10 Collins Street, Morningside, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 14 Aug 2018 to 17 Oct 2018
Address #2: 19 Ruru Street, Eden Terrace, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 27 Jun 2017 to 14 Aug 2018
Address #3: 32 Nikau Street, Eden Terrace, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 29 Aug 2016 to 27 Jun 2017
Address #4: Flat 3, 8 Edenvale Park Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Physical address used from 18 Feb 2016 to 29 Aug 2016
Address #5: Flat 3, 8 Edenvale Park Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Registered address used from 01 Dec 2015 to 29 Aug 2016
Address #6: Flat 3, 7 Western Springs Road, Morningside, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Registered address used from 08 May 2015 to 01 Dec 2015
Address #7: Flat 3, 7 Western Springs Road, Morningside, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Physical address used from 08 May 2015 to 18 Feb 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 06 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Wills, Adrian |
Te Atatu South Auckland 0602 New Zealand |
27 Oct 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 600 | |||
Other (Other) | Lightning Lab Auckland 2016 Lp |
Eden Terrace Auckland 1021 New Zealand |
12 May 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 8900 | |||
Director | Van Der Meel, Andrea Maria |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
08 May 2015 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Armstrong, Richard John |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 New Zealand |
12 May 2016 - 03 Jul 2016 |
Andrea Maria Van Der Meel - Director
Appointment date: 08 May 2015
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Sep 2016
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2017
Zen Lunchbox Limited
8/3 Ngahura Street
Manuka Enterprises Limited
7 Akiraho Street
Regal Limited
7 Akiraho Street
Regal Fine Jewellery Wholesale Limited
7 Akiraho Street
Arkm Group Limited
13 Akiraho Street
Kellylin Couture Limited
96 New North Road
Auror Limited
32 Nikau Street
Brycom Data Limited
Unit 24, 3 Ngahura St
Construction Software Limited
32 Shaddock Street
Eyemobi Limited
32 Shaddock Street
Gisolutions Limited
Flat 21, 3 Ngahura Street
Viia Studio Limited
28 Shaddock Street