Leading Homes Limited was launched on 05 Aug 2015 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429041887219. The registered LTD company has been run by 1 director, named Atama Anton O'donnell - an active director whose contract started on 05 Aug 2015.
According to the BizDb data (last updated on 25 Jul 2024), the company registered 2 addresses: 5 Ludbrook Road, Rd 2, Moerewa, 0472 (physical address),
5 Ludbrook Road, Rd 2, Moerewa, 0472 (service address),
5 Ludbrook Road, Rd 2, Kaikohe, 0472 (registered address).
Until 17 Sep 2019, Leading Homes Limited had been using 4 Blacks Road, Greenhithe, Auckland as their physical address.
BizDb found previous names for the company: from 05 Aug 2015 to 10 Nov 2016 they were named O'donnell Builders Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Williams, Rhiannon Grace (an individual) located at Rd 2, Kaikohe postcode 0472.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 99 per cent shares (exactly 99 shares) and includes
O'donnell, Atama Anton - located at Rd 2, Kaikohe. Leading Homes Limited was classified as "Repair (general) or renovation of residential buildings nec" (business classification E301920).
Principal place of activity
5 Ludbrook Road, Rd 2, Kaikohe, 0472 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 4 Blacks Road, Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Physical address used from 21 Aug 2018 to 17 Sep 2019
Address #2: 5 Chamberlain Road, Rd1, Bombay, 2675 New Zealand
Physical address used from 11 Aug 2017 to 21 Aug 2018
Address #3: Level 3, 12 Huron Street, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Registered address used from 05 Aug 2015 to 19 Jun 2017
Address #4: Level 3, 12 Huron Street, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Physical address used from 05 Aug 2015 to 11 Aug 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 07 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Williams, Rhiannon Grace |
Rd 2 Kaikohe 0472 New Zealand |
30 Sep 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Director | O'donnell, Atama Anton |
Rd 2 Kaikohe 0472 New Zealand |
05 Aug 2015 - |
Atama Anton O'donnell - Director
Appointment date: 05 Aug 2015
Address: Rd 2, Kaikohe, 0472 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2017
Address: Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Oct 2015
Kw Cave Trust Company Limited
Level 3
Bill Bayes No 52 Limited
Level 3
The Flooring People Limited
Level 3
Kw Donovan Trust Company Limited
Level 3
Carvers Corner Limited
12 Huron Street
Eqp 2012 Limited
Level 3
Anz Export Limited
3/425 Lake Rd, Takapuna,
Heaton Grove Limited
61 Hurstmere Road
North Projects Boi Limited
40 Taharoto Road
Plan It Contracting Limited
Level 3
Provester Limited
5a Crichton Terrace
The Renovation Team Limited
94 Anzac Street