Chong Family Kw Trustee Limited was incorporated on 13 Oct 2015 and issued a number of 9429042014805. The registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: Stuart Jason Weir - an active director whose contract began on 13 Oct 2015,
Michael Peter Kemps - an inactive director whose contract began on 13 Oct 2015 and was terminated on 19 Jan 2023,
Peter Albertus Theodorus Maria Kemps - an inactive director whose contract began on 13 Oct 2015 and was terminated on 31 Dec 2020.
According to our database (last updated on 17 Jul 2024), this company registered 1 address: Ground Floor, Building 1, Central Park, 660-670 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 (type: physical, registered).
Until 03 Sep 2020, Chong Family Kw Trustee Limited had been using 666 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Kw Trustees Holding Company Limited (an entity) located at 660-670 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland postcode 1051. Chong Family Kw Trustee Limited has been classified as "Trustee service" (business classification K641965).
Previous address
Address: 666 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1544 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 13 Oct 2015 to 03 Sep 2020
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 23 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Kw Trustees Holding Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041408759 |
660-670 Great South Road, Greenlane Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
13 Oct 2015 - |
Ultimate Holding Company
Stuart Jason Weir - Director
Appointment date: 13 Oct 2015
Address: Birkenhead, Auckland, 0626 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Oct 2015
Michael Peter Kemps - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Oct 2015
Termination date: 19 Jan 2023
Address: Mangere Bridge, Auckland, 2022 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Oct 2015
Peter Albertus Theodorus Maria Kemps - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Oct 2015
Termination date: 31 Dec 2020
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Oct 2015
Cpso Limited
L3, Building 10, 666 Gt Sth Rd
Ws Audiology Anz Pty Ltd
Lvl 5, Bldg 5, Central Park Corp. Centre
Dynanet It Services Limited
Level 3, Building 10, Suite 8
Blackmores (new Zealand) Limited
Level 4, Building 10
2 Ez Limited
Ground Floor Building 10 Central Park
Dimension Software Limited
Building 5, 666 Great South Road
Barclay-di Matteo Kw Trustee Limited
666 Great South Road
Beelys Kw Trustee Limited
666 Great South Road
Broughton Kw Trustee Limited
666 Great South Road
Glan-y-mor Kw Trustee Limited
666 Great South Road
Hairy Bear Kw Trustee Limited
666 Great South Road
Russell Kw Trustee Limited
666 Great South Road