Lewislegal (N Wang) Trustees Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 23 Jun 2016. 9429042414858 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is how the company has been categorised. The company has been run by 6 directors: Lisa Julie Ware - an active director whose contract began on 23 Jun 2016,
Matthew Simon Makgill - an active director whose contract began on 23 Jun 2016,
Lucy Anne Young - an active director whose contract began on 24 Jun 2020,
Monique Leigh Medley-Rush - an inactive director whose contract began on 24 Jun 2020 and was terminated on 12 Apr 2024,
Mayuan Si - an inactive director whose contract began on 24 Jun 2020 and was terminated on 17 Dec 2021.
Updated on 21 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: Cnr Dick & Alpha Streets, Cambridge, 3434 (types include: physical, registered).
A total of 120 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 60 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 60 shares (50%).
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 120
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 06 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 60 | |||
Director | Makgill, Matthew Simon |
Leamington Cambridge 3432 New Zealand |
23 Jun 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 60 | |||
Director | Ware, Lisa Julie |
Rd 1 Cambridge 3493 New Zealand |
23 Jun 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Makgill, Simon Redding |
Rd 3 Cambridge 3495 New Zealand |
23 Jun 2016 - 03 Jul 2020 |
Lisa Julie Ware - Director
Appointment date: 23 Jun 2016
Address: Rd 1, Cambridge, 3493 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jun 2016
Matthew Simon Makgill - Director
Appointment date: 23 Jun 2016
Address: Leamington, Cambridge, 3432 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jun 2016
Lucy Anne Young - Director
Appointment date: 24 Jun 2020
Address: Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Jun 2020
Monique Leigh Medley-rush - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Jun 2020
Termination date: 12 Apr 2024
Address: Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Jun 2020
Mayuan Si - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Jun 2020
Termination date: 17 Dec 2021
Address: Hillcrest, Hamilton, 3216 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Jun 2020
Simon Redding Makgill - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Jun 2016
Termination date: 24 Jun 2020
Address: Rd 3, Cambridge, 3495 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jun 2016
Te Mara Properties Limited
Cnr Dick & Alpha Streets
Lewislegal Trustees 2011 Limited
Cnr Dick & Alpha Streets
Lewislegal Trustees 2009 Limited
Cnr Dick Street & Alpha Street
Lewislegal Trustees 2008 Limited
Cnr Dick & Alpha Streets
Lewislegal Trustees 2007 Limited
Cnr Dick & Alpha Streets
Spike Developments Limited
Cnr Dick & Alpha Streets
Lewislegal Trustees 2010 Limited
Cnr Dick Street & Alpha Street
Lewislegal Trustees 2011 Limited
Cnr Dick & Alpha Streets
Lewislegal Trustees 2012 Limited
Cnr Dick & Alpha Streets
Lewislegal Trustees 2013 Limited
Cnr Dick & Alpha Streets
Lewislegal Trustees 2014 Limited
Cnr Dick & Alpha Streets
Lewislegal Trustees 2015 Limited
Cnr Dick & Alpha Streets