Exeloo Holdings Limited, a registered company, was launched on 01 Jul 2016. 9429042438342 is the number it was issued. "Holding company operation - passive investment in subsidiary companies" (business classification K624030) is how the company was categorised. The company has been managed by 4 directors: Craig John Van Asch - an active director whose contract began on 01 Apr 2020,
Andrew Roy Harris - an active director whose contract began on 01 Apr 2020,
Christine Jane Glew - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Jul 2016 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2020,
Daniel John Glew - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Jul 2016 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2020.
Last updated on 02 Sep 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 20-22 Paramount Drive, Henderson, Auckland, 0610 (type: registered, service).
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 3534606 shares) - Harvani Limited - located at 0610, Parnell, Auckland.
Principal place of activity
26 Paramount Drive, Henderson, Auckland, 0610 New Zealand
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 3534606
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 11 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 3534606 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Harvani Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047858213 |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
09 Apr 2020 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Zental Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031561969 Company Number: 2467232 |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
01 Jul 2016 - 09 Apr 2020 |
Individual | Glew, Christine Jane |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
01 Jul 2016 - 09 Apr 2020 |
Individual | Glew, Daniel John |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
01 Jul 2016 - 09 Apr 2020 |
Entity | Zental Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031561969 Company Number: 2467232 |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
01 Jul 2016 - 09 Apr 2020 |
Entity | Zental Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031561969 Company Number: 2467232 |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
01 Jul 2016 - 09 Apr 2020 |
Entity | Zental Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031561969 Company Number: 2467232 |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
01 Jul 2016 - 09 Apr 2020 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Craig John Van Asch - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2020
Address: Rd 1, Waimauku, 0881 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Apr 2023
Address: Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2020
Andrew Roy Harris - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2020
Address: Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Sep 2023
Address: 16 Chapman Street, Grey Lynn, 1021 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2020
Christine Jane Glew - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2016
Termination date: 01 Apr 2020
Address: Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2016
Daniel John Glew - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2016
Termination date: 01 Apr 2020
Address: Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2016
Exeweb Control Limited
26 Paramount Drive
Ecoloo Limited
26 Paramount Drive
Duraclenz Limited
26 Paramount Drive
Exeloo Limited
26 Paramount Drive
Summer Supply Property Limited
28 Paramount Drive
Nz Towing 2015 Limited
24 Paramount Drive
Brs Holdings Limited
5 Parkvale Grove
K Hussona Holdings Limited
Lincoln Manor
Kiwi Whare Tu Limited
7 Stephen Avenue
Mwc Nz Limited
293 Lincoln Road
New Zealand Family Healthcare Group Limited
2/33-35 Waipareira Ave
Schmid Investments Limited
10a Montmere Avenue