J & C Milford Trading Limited was registered on 08 Jul 2016 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429042448884. The registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Chi Thi Quynh Pham - an inactive director whose contract started on 26 Nov 2018 and was terminated on 10 Sep 2019,
Chi Thi Quynh Pham - an inactive director whose contract started on 08 Jul 2016 and was terminated on 02 Sep 2016,
Phuong Van Ngo - an inactive director whose contract started on 02 Sep 2016 and was terminated on 02 Sep 2016.
According to BizDb's data (last updated on 15 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: Shop 1, 14 Jervois Rd, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021 (types include: postal, physical).
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 840 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Ngo, Phuong Van (an individual) located at Mt Eden, Auckland postcode 1024.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 16 per cent shares (exactly 160 shares) and includes
Pham, Chi Thi Quynh - located at Torbay, Auckland. J & C Milford Trading Limited is classified as "Manicure service" (business classification S951135).
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 15 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 840 | |||
Individual | Ngo, Phuong Van |
Mt Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
08 Jul 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 160 | |||
Individual | Pham, Chi Thi Quynh |
Torbay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
15 Jan 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Pham, Chi Thi Quynh |
Mt Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
08 Jul 2016 - 29 Jul 2016 |
Individual | Cao, Trung |
Henderson Auckland 0612 New Zealand |
24 Feb 2022 - 17 May 2022 |
Individual | Dinh, Thi Hien |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 New Zealand |
29 Jul 2016 - 05 Sep 2016 |
Director | Chi Thi Quynh Pham |
Mt Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
08 Jul 2016 - 29 Jul 2016 |
Chi Thi Quynh Pham - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Nov 2018
Termination date: 10 Sep 2019
Address: Torbay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Nov 2018
Chi Thi Quynh Pham - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Jul 2016
Termination date: 02 Sep 2016
Address: Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jul 2016
Phuong Van Ngo - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Sep 2016
Termination date: 02 Sep 2016
Address: Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Sep 2016
Address: Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Sep 2016
Agape Food Nz Limited
144 Kitchener Road
Kongwatana Limited
142 Kitchener Road
Posh Labels Limited
Shop 7
Jade Therapy Limited
3/160 Kitchener Road
Shore Fashion Limited
Shop 8, 160 Kitchener Rd
Jtk Limited
140 Kitchener Road
Alex89 Limited
20 Taharoto Road
American Nail Shop Limited
1/7 Normanton Street
Enticed By Nails Limited
20 Belmont Terrace
Everlast Nail & Waxing ( Eastridge) Limited
6a Peach Road
Everlast Nail & Waxing (albany) Limited
6a Peach Road
Everlast Nail & Waxing (northwest) Limited
6a Peach Road