Nelson Tramping Club Incorporated, a registered company, was started on 13 Oct 1950. 9429042675853 is the NZBN it was issued. The company has been supervised by 7 directors: Maaike Van Hoeflaken - an active officer whose contract began on 10 Jan 2024,
Karen Deborah Hogan - an active officer whose contract began on 11 Jan 2024,
Graeme John Ferrier - an active officer whose contract began on 11 Jan 2024,
Michele Claire Cunningham - an active officer whose contract began on 14 Jan 2024,
Michele Cunningham - an inactive officer whose contract began on 10 Jan 2024 and was terminated on 14 Jan 2024.
Updated on 31 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 4 addresses this company registered, namely: C/- 114 Vanguard St, Nelson (postal address),
114 Vanguard Street, Nelson South, Nelson 7010 (registered address),
C/O Wises Picture Framing, 78 Buxton Square, Nelson (postal address),
C/O Wises Picture Framing, 78 Buxton Square, Nelson (registered address) among others.
Other active addresses
Maaike Van Hoeflaken - officer
Appointment date: 10 Jan 2024
Karen Deborah Hogan - officer
Appointment date: 11 Jan 2024
Graeme John Ferrier - officer
Appointment date: 11 Jan 2024
Michele Claire Cunningham - officer
Appointment date: 14 Jan 2024
Michele Cunningham - officer
Appointment date: 10 Jan 2024
Termination date: 14 Jan 2024
Debbie K Hogan - officer
Appointment date: 10 Jan 2024
Termination date: 11 Jan 2024
Graeme Ferrier - officer
Appointment date: 10 Jan 2024
Termination date: 11 Jan 2024
Nelson Camera Club Incorporated
C/o Wises Picture Framing
Rogers Heavy Mechanical Repairs Limited
Whitby House, Level 3, 7 Alma Street
Mi Gym Nelson Limited
Migym
Swanney Limited
209-219 Trafalgar Street
Beneficiaries And Unwaged Workers Trust
75b Bridge St
Upshift Limited
62 Bridge Street