Solid Concrete Foundations Limited, an in liquidation company, was launched on 07 Oct 2016. 9429043354016 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Foundation construction - concrete" (ANZSIC E322150) is how the company has been categorised. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Jahmin Zion-Rastafari-I Murphy - an active director whose contract started on 07 Oct 2016,
Tane Arama Allen - an active director whose contract started on 01 Dec 2017.
Updated on 15 Nov 2023, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 161 Cashel Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch 8011 (types include: registered, service).
Solid Concrete Foundations Limited had been using Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland as their registered address until 22 Jul 2020.
Former names for this company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 27 Sep 2016 to 07 Dec 2017 they were called Jahmin Murphy Contracting Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 50 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered address used from 25 Sep 2019 to 22 Jul 2020
Address #2: Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered address used from 29 Oct 2018 to 25 Sep 2019
Address #3: Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical address used from 29 Oct 2018 to 22 Jul 2020
Address #4: 31 Fitzherbert Avenue, West Harbour, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Registered address used from 17 Jul 2018 to 29 Oct 2018
Address #5: 4011 Great North Road, Glen Eden, Auckland, 0602 New Zealand
Registered address used from 09 Oct 2017 to 17 Jul 2018
Address #6: 31 Fitzherbert Avenue, West Harbour, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Physical address used from 07 Oct 2016 to 29 Oct 2018
Address #7: 31 Fitzherbert Avenue, West Harbour, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Registered address used from 07 Oct 2016 to 09 Oct 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 17 Sep 2019
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Allen, Tane Arama |
Westgate Auckland 0614 New Zealand |
18 Jan 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Murphy, Jahmin Zion-rastafari-i |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 New Zealand |
07 Oct 2016 - |
Jahmin Zion-rastafari-i Murphy - Director
Appointment date: 07 Oct 2016
Address: West Harbour, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Oct 2016
Tane Arama Allen - Director
Appointment date: 01 Dec 2017
Address: Westgate, Auckland, 0614 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2017
Western Kitchen Limited
4011 Great North Road
Cleanline Bathrooms Limited
4011 Great North Road
Carpentry Nz Limited
4011 Great North Road
Hawkes Flooring Limited
4011 Great North Road
Rnr Repairs Limited
4011 Great North Road
Glanville Trustees Limited
4011 Great North Road
Icon Building Limited
15 Volcanic Street
Lonsdale Masonry Limited
394 Huia Road
Smart Slabs Limited
3 Wainui Avenue
Stonescaping Limited
86a Stamford Park Road
Youi Homes Limited
8a Harry Ward Place
Z & W Construction Limited
116 Hutchinson Avenue