Wiretech (Auckland) Limited was incorporated on 08 Nov 2016 and issued an NZBN of 9429043373659. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Thomas Alexander Samual Grogan - an active director whose contract began on 08 Nov 2016,
Tim William Field - an inactive director whose contract began on 08 Nov 2016 and was terminated on 07 May 2018.
As stated in our information (last updated on 02 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: 8 Vera Court, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 (type: registered, service).
Up until 03 Dec 2020, Wiretech (Auckland) Limited had been using 9 Whaley Greens, Silverdale, Silverdale as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 40 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Burchall, Anna Jayne (an individual) located at Silverdale, Silverdale postcode 0932.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 60 per cent shares (exactly 60 shares) and includes
Grogan, Thomas Alexander Samual - located at Silverdale, Silverdale. Wiretech (Auckland) Limited has been categorised as "Electrical services" (business classification E323220).
Principal place of activity
72 Wainui Road, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 9 Whaley Greens, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 09 Mar 2020 to 03 Dec 2020
Address #2: Level 1- 136 Ilam Road, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 08 Nov 2016 to 09 Mar 2020
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 02 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 40 | |||
Individual | Burchall, Anna Jayne |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 New Zealand |
09 May 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 60 | |||
Director | Grogan, Thomas Alexander Samual |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 New Zealand |
08 Nov 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Williams, Grant Neil |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
08 Nov 2016 - 09 May 2018 |
Individual | Field, Helena Ann |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
08 Nov 2016 - 09 May 2018 |
Director | Tim William Field |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
08 Nov 2016 - 09 May 2018 |
Individual | Field, Tim William |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
08 Nov 2016 - 09 May 2018 |
Director | Tim William Field |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
08 Nov 2016 - 09 May 2018 |
Thomas Alexander Samual Grogan - Director
Appointment date: 08 Nov 2016
Address: Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Feb 2023
Address: Silverdale, Auckland, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Nov 2020
Address: Silverdale, Auckland, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Nov 2016
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Nov 2016
Tim William Field - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Nov 2016
Termination date: 07 May 2018
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Nov 2016
Smith Elements & Controls Limited
Level 1, 136 Ilam Road
Williams Corporation Trading 16 Limited
Level 1, 136 Ilam Road
Wwl Trustee Services 119 Limited
Level 1, 10 Leslie Hills Drive
Canrecruit Holdings Limited
Level 1, 136 Ilam Road
Canrecruit Auckland South Limited
Level 1, 136 Ilam Road
Southern Gardening Services Limited
Level 1, 136 Ilam Road
Al.ferg Electrical Limited
314 Riccarton Road
Coghlan Electrical Limited
314 Riccarton Road
Entire Electrical Solutions Limited
Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House
Entire Electrical Solutions North Island Limited
Ainger Tomlin House, 136 Ilam Road
Macklin Consultancy Limited
Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House
Newlight Company Limited
27 Maidstone Road