Matthews & Hassan Limited, a registered company, was registered on 26 Apr 2017. 9429046087843 is the NZBN it was issued. "Optometrist" (ANZSIC Q853240) is how the company is categorised. The company has been managed by 4 directors: Francis Christopher Hassan - an active director whose contract started on 26 Apr 2017,
Philip John Matthews - an active director whose contract started on 26 Apr 2017,
Simon Joseph Hassan - an active director whose contract started on 09 May 2019,
John Lawrence Grylls - an active director whose contract started on 09 May 2019.
Updated on 31 Jul 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 2 Alfred Street, Blenheim, 7201 (type: registered, service).
Matthews & Hassan Limited had been using 72 Trafalgar Street, Nelson, Nelson as their registered address up until 01 Oct 2019.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 50 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 72 Trafalgar Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Oct 2018 to 01 Oct 2019
Address #2: 72-74 Vickerman Street, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Apr 2017 to 05 Oct 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 31 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Matthews Eyewear.eyecare. Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032949445 |
Nelson Nelson 7010 New Zealand |
26 Apr 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Hassan, Francis Christopher |
Springlands Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
26 Apr 2017 - |
Francis Christopher Hassan - Director
Appointment date: 26 Apr 2017
Address: Springlands, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Apr 2017
Philip John Matthews - Director
Appointment date: 26 Apr 2017
Address: Nelson South, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Apr 2017
Simon Joseph Hassan - Director
Appointment date: 09 May 2019
Address: Rd 1, Nelson, 7071 New Zealand
Address used since 09 May 2019
John Lawrence Grylls - Director
Appointment date: 09 May 2019
Address: Waikanae, Waikanae, 5036 New Zealand
Address used since 09 May 2019
Kura Limited
Vickerman Street
King Reef Seafoods Nz Limited
Vickerman Street
Sealord Shellfish Limited
Vickerman Street
Sealord Group Limited
Vickerman Street
Flightcell International Limited
98 Vickerman Street
Flightcell New Zealand Limited
98 Vickerman Street
Capitaleyes Optometrists Limited
12 Donald Crescent
Matthews & Bell Limited
72 Trafalgar Street
Matthews Eyewear.eyecare. Limited
Crowe Horwath Nelson
Nelson Eye Specialists Limited
7 Alma Street
Sports Visionz Limited
220 Ohiro Road
Vision Plus Limited
Greenock House