E & P Foundation Trustee Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 19 Jul 2017. 9429046249937 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Trustee service" (business classification K641965) is how the company is categorised. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: John Michael Thorman - an active director whose contract started on 28 Nov 2022,
Paul James Devereux - an inactive director whose contract started on 19 Jul 2017 and was terminated on 28 Nov 2022.
Last updated on 18 Sep 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 5, 79 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, service).
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 1000 shares) - Csnz Trustees Limited - located at 1010, 79 Queen Street, Auckland.
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 05 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Csnz Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048928793 |
79 Queen Street Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
28 Nov 2022 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Devereux, Paul James |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
19 Jul 2017 - 28 Nov 2022 |
John Michael Thorman - Director
Appointment date: 28 Nov 2022
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Nov 2022
Paul James Devereux - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Jul 2017
Termination date: 28 Nov 2022
Address: Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Jul 2017
Lex Trustee Company Limited
27 Bradford Street
Corporate Counsel Limited
27 Bradford Street
Motu Trustee Pty Limited
27 Bradford Street
Corporate Handymen Limited
27 Bradford Street
Paul Devereux Consulting Limited
27 Bradford Street
Potentis Technology Investments Limited
27 Bradford Street
Covisory (nz) Trust Limited
Suite B, 7 Windsor Street
Covisory Trust Holdings Limited
Suite B, 7 Windsor Street
Covisory Trust Limited
Suite B, 7 Windsor Street
Haines Trustee Limited
Suite 2, 7 Windsor Street
Lh Wilcox Trustee Limited
Suite C, 7 Windsor Street
Tps Trustee Nz Limited
Suite 2, 7 Windsor Street