Kjs Independent Trustee Company Limited, a registered company, was launched on 28 Aug 2017. 9429046319104 is the number it was issued. "Trustee service" (business classification K641965) is how the company has been classified. The company has been managed by 11 directors: Kirsty Anne Mcdonald - an active director whose contract began on 28 Aug 2017,
Kirsty Anne Mcdonald - an active director whose contract began on 28 Aug 2017,
Susan Jane Garmonsway - an active director whose contract began on 28 Aug 2017,
Bryce Owen Bluett - an active director whose contract began on 14 Sep 2021,
Shelley Elizabeth Greer - an active director whose contract began on 22 Mar 2022.
Last updated on 04 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 380 Alexandra Street, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 (types include: physical, service).
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Gallie Miles Trustees Limited - located at 3800, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu.
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 18 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Gallie Miles Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429049000290 |
Te Awamutu Te Awamutu 3800 New Zealand |
28 Mar 2022 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Garmonsway, Susan Jane |
Te Awamutu Te Awamutu 3800 New Zealand |
28 Aug 2017 - 28 Mar 2022 |
Individual | Mackay, Valerie Jane |
Cambridge 3495 New Zealand |
28 Aug 2017 - 11 Jun 2019 |
Director | Garmonsway, Susan Jane |
Te Awamutu Te Awamutu 3800 New Zealand |
28 Aug 2017 - 28 Mar 2022 |
Director | Garmonsway, Susan Jane |
Te Awamutu Te Awamutu 3800 New Zealand |
28 Aug 2017 - 28 Mar 2022 |
Director | Bluett, Bryce Owen |
Forest Lake Hamilton 3200 New Zealand |
07 Dec 2021 - 28 Mar 2022 |
Director | Mcdonald, Kirsty Anne |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 New Zealand |
28 Aug 2017 - 28 Mar 2022 |
Director | Mcdonald, Kirsty Anne |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 New Zealand |
28 Aug 2017 - 28 Mar 2022 |
Director | Mcdonald, Kirsty Anne |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 New Zealand |
28 Aug 2017 - 28 Mar 2022 |
Director | Mcdonald, Kirsty Anne |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 New Zealand |
28 Aug 2017 - 28 Mar 2022 |
Director | Garmonsway, Susan Jane |
Te Awamutu Te Awamutu 3800 New Zealand |
28 Aug 2017 - 28 Mar 2022 |
Director | Garmonsway, Susan Jane |
Te Awamutu Te Awamutu 3800 New Zealand |
28 Aug 2017 - 28 Mar 2022 |
Individual | Miles, Linda Maree |
Te Awamutu Te Awamutu 3800 New Zealand |
28 Aug 2017 - 11 Dec 2019 |
Kirsty Anne Mcdonald - Director
Appointment date: 28 Aug 2017
Address: Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Aug 2017
Kirsty Anne Mcdonald - Director
Appointment date: 28 Aug 2017
Address: Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Aug 2017
Susan Jane Garmonsway - Director
Appointment date: 28 Aug 2017
Address: Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Mar 2019
Address: Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Aug 2017
Bryce Owen Bluett - Director
Appointment date: 14 Sep 2021
Address: Forest Lake, Hamilton, 3200 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Sep 2021
Shelley Elizabeth Greer - Director
Appointment date: 22 Mar 2022
Address: Wharewaka, Taupo, 3330 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Apr 2024
Address: Kihikihi, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Mar 2023
Address: Rd 3, Ohaupo, 3883 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Mar 2022
Alexander Hugh Mcivor - Director
Appointment date: 01 Oct 2022
Address: Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Oct 2022
Susan Jane Garmonsway - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Aug 2017
Termination date: 01 Apr 2024
Address: Pirongia, Pirongia, 3802 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Mar 2023
Address: Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Mar 2019
Linda Maree Miles - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Aug 2017
Termination date: 01 Dec 2019
Address: Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Aug 2017
Linda Maree Miles - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Aug 2017
Termination date: 01 Dec 2019
Address: Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Aug 2017
Valerie Jane Mackay - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Aug 2017
Termination date: 01 Jun 2019
Address: Cambridge, 3495 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Aug 2017
Valerie Jane Mackay - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Aug 2017
Termination date: 01 Jun 2019
Address: Cambridge, 3495 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Aug 2017
Bell Independent Trustee Company Limited
380 Alexandra Street
Dyet Independent Trustee Company Limited
380 Alexandra Street
Racheal Matthews Trustee Limited
380 Alexandra Street
Te Awamutu Trustees No 5 Limited
380 Alexandra Street
Gunson Independent Trustee Limited
380 Alexandra Street
The Leon Ramsey Trustee Company Limited
380 Alexandra Street
Bell Independent Trustee Company Limited
380 Alexandra Street
Dyet Independent Trustee Company Limited
380 Alexandra Street
Fordham Independent Trustees Limited
380 Alexandra Street
Kge Independent Trustee Company Limited
380 Alexandra Street
Steve And Dana Trustee Company Limited
380 Alexandra Street
Te Awamutu Trustees No 5 Limited
380 Alexandra Street