23 Investments Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 01 Aug 2018. 9429046931290 is the business number it was issued. "Holding company operation - passive investment in subsidiary companies" (ANZSIC K624030) is how the company has been categorised. The company has been supervised by 3 directors: Kerri Fargher - an active director whose contract began on 01 Aug 2018,
Kerri Ramos - an active director whose contract began on 01 Aug 2018,
Kerri Ramos Silva - an active director whose contract began on 01 Aug 2018.
Updated on 10 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 2 addresses this company registered, namely: 11 Kayes Road, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 (registered address),
11 Kayes Road, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 (physical address),
11 Kayes Road, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 (service address),
10A Parma Place, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 (office address) among others.
23 Investments Limited had been using 10A Parma Place, Henderson, Auckland as their physical address up until 29 Oct 2020.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Fargher, Kerri - located at 2120, Pukekohe, Pukekohe.
Principal place of activity
10a Parma Place, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: 10a Parma Place, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 01 Aug 2018 to 29 Oct 2020
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 31 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Fargher, Kerri |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 New Zealand |
01 Apr 2024 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Ramos, Kerri |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 New Zealand |
01 Aug 2018 - 01 Apr 2024 |
Director | Ramos, Kerri |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 New Zealand |
01 Aug 2018 - 01 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Ramos Silva, Diego |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 New Zealand |
01 Aug 2018 - 07 Mar 2023 |
Kerri Fargher - Director
Appointment date: 01 Aug 2018
Address: Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Sep 2020
Kerri Ramos - Director
Appointment date: 01 Aug 2018
Address: Henderson, Auckland, 0612 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2018
Kerri Ramos Silva - Director
Appointment date: 01 Aug 2018
Address: Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Sep 2020
Address: Henderson, Auckland, 0612 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2018
Outrageous Signs Limited
30b Chislehurst Street
North Memorials Henderson (2016) Limited
Flat 2, 14 Dalmatia Place
Butchery Services Limited
126 Bruce Mclaren Road
Tautua Ma Le Faamaoni
2/130 Bruce Mc Laren Road
Aiga First Streetwear Limited
98 Borich Road
Pure Property (2014) Limited
114 Borich Road
22:22 Limited
185 Forest Hill Road
Juralco Holdings Limited
48 Bruce Mclaren Road
Rangeview Road Family Company Limited
75 Rangeview Road
The Founders Holding Limited
Unit 2, 3 Edsel Street
Watts Family Limited
175 Forest Hill Road
Wills Private Equity Investments Limited
72 Shaw Road