German Auto Parts Limited, a registered company, was launched on 23 Aug 2013. 9429030098794 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150) is how the company was classified. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Adam Rossiter - an active director whose contract began on 23 Aug 2013,
David Peterson - an active director whose contract began on 23 Aug 2013.
Last updated on 31 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 233 Whites Road, Rd 2, Kaiapoi, 7692 (type: physical, service).
German Auto Parts Limited had been using 10 Cephas Close, Sockburn, Christchurch as their physical address up until 30 Sep 2016.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders (3 groups). The first group consists of 49 shares (49 per cent) held by 3 entities. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (1 per cent). Lastly the 3rd share allotment (50 shares 50 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
233 Whites Road, Rd 2, Kaiapoi, 7692 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 10 Cephas Close, Sockburn, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Physical address used from 23 Aug 2013 to 30 Sep 2016
Address #2: 10 Cephas Close, Sockburn, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Registered address used from 23 Aug 2013 to 29 Sep 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 04 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 49 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Ct (peterson) Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048281942 |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8011 New Zealand |
09 Oct 2020 - |
Individual | Gray, Colin |
Christchurch 8042 New Zealand |
23 Aug 2013 - |
Director | Peterson, David |
Rd 2 Ohoka 7692 New Zealand |
23 Aug 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Peterson, David |
Rd 2 Ohoka 7692 New Zealand |
23 Aug 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Rossiter, Adam |
Addington Christchurch 8024 New Zealand |
23 Aug 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Peterson, Ian |
Upper Riccarton Christchurch 8042 New Zealand |
23 Aug 2013 - 03 Sep 2020 |
Adam Rossiter - Director
Appointment date: 23 Aug 2013
Address: Addington, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Aug 2013
David Peterson - Director
Appointment date: 23 Aug 2013
Address: Rd 2, Kaiapoi, 7692 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Sep 2016
Garden City Wholesale Limited
233 Whites Road
Repertoire Media Limited
224 Whites Road
Repertoire Holdings Limited
224 Whites Road
F4t Investments Limited
232 Whites Road
Araglin Limited
232 Whites Road
Stevenson Stewardship Limited
219 Whites Road
Aveda Limited
32 Biella Place
Exeter Investments Limited
103 Ohoka Meadows Drive
F4t Investments Limited
232 Whites Road
H & S Investment Partners Limited
24 Elders Road
Liken Enterprises Limited
106 North Eyre Road
Roquefort Property And Consulting Limited
802 Tram Road