Sum D Limited was registered on 19 Jul 2013 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429030139879. This registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: Hara Kang - an active director whose contract began on 01 Jul 2017,
Myung-Jun Lee - an inactive director whose contract began on 03 Dec 2015 and was terminated on 01 Jul 2017,
Sun Hoon Kim - an inactive director whose contract began on 19 Jul 2013 and was terminated on 03 Dec 2015.
According to BizDb's data (updated on 20 Aug 2024), the company filed 1 address: Level 10, 34 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (category: registered, delivery).
Up to 29 Sep 2022, Sum D Limited had been using 10C Morningside Drive, Morningside, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 1000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
K & R Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010. Sum D Limited was categorised as "Cosmetic retailing" (ANZSIC G427120).
Principal place of activity
Suite 3, 1 Gibraltar Crescent, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 10c Morningside Drive, Morningside, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Registered address used from 17 Mar 2021 to 29 Sep 2022
Address #2: Level 8, 44 Anzac Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical address used from 11 Jul 2019 to 17 Mar 2021
Address #3: Level 8, 44 Anzac Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered address used from 16 Jul 2018 to 17 Mar 2021
Address #4: Suite 7, 88 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Registered address used from 22 May 2017 to 16 Jul 2018
Address #5: Suite 7, 88 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical address used from 22 May 2017 to 11 Jul 2019
Address #6: Suite 3, 1 Gibraltar Crescent, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Jul 2014 to 22 May 2017
Address #7: 312 Te Atatu Road, Te Atatu South, Auckland, 0610 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 19 Jul 2013 to 11 Jul 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 28 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | K & R Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051329945 |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
29 Jun 2023 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Ryoo, Byung Hyun |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
19 Jul 2013 - 29 Jun 2023 |
Individual | Kang, Hara |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
19 Jul 2013 - 29 Jun 2023 |
Individual | Kang, Hara |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
19 Jul 2013 - 29 Jun 2023 |
Individual | Ryoo, Byung Hyun |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
19 Jul 2013 - 29 Jun 2023 |
Director | Sun Hoon Kim |
Te Atatu South Auckland 0610 New Zealand |
19 Jul 2013 - 03 Dec 2015 |
Individual | Lee, Myung-jun |
Hillsborough Auckland 1042 New Zealand |
03 Dec 2015 - 20 Jan 2018 |
Individual | Kim, Sun Hoon |
Te Atatu South Auckland 0610 New Zealand |
19 Jul 2013 - 03 Dec 2015 |
Hara Kang - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2017
Address: Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Jun 2021
Address: Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2017
Address: Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Jul 2019
Myung-jun Lee - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Dec 2015
Termination date: 01 Jul 2017
Address: Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Dec 2015
Sun Hoon Kim - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Jul 2013
Termination date: 03 Dec 2015
Address: Te Atatu South, Auckland, 0610 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Jul 2013
Tearaffe Limited
Suite 8, 88 Broadway
Apple Investments Limited
Care Of Prudentia Law
Orchard View Investment Limited
4/128 Broadway
Trustee 802-3024 Limited
Level 4
Ipacific Group Trustee Limited
Level 4
Trustee 706-3302 Limited
Level 4
Absolute Body&skin Limited
383d Khyber Pass Road
Demo To Reno Limited
2/23 Ayr Street
Eleanor Dorn Makeup Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Hu Trading Limited
Suite 1, 8 Alma Street
Just Divine Limited
Level 2, 3 Margot Street
Tapestry Natural Nz Limited
Level 6 / 393 Khyber Pass Road