Nh Trustees No.8 Limited was launched on 02 Jul 2013 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429030164864. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 5 directors: John Stirling - an active director whose contract started on 02 Jul 2013,
Michael Julius Robinson - an active director whose contract started on 02 Jul 2013,
Philip John Shannon - an active director whose contract started on 05 Aug 2019,
Samuel James Ames - an active director whose contract started on 10 Jun 2024,
Michael Otway Newdick - an inactive director whose contract started on 02 Jul 2013 and was terminated on 21 May 2024.
According to BizDb's data (updated on 20 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: Floor 1, 1 The Strand, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 (category: registered, service).
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 3 groups (3 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 33 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Stirling, John (a director) located at Campbells Bay, Auckland postcode 0630.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 33 per cent shares (exactly 33 shares) and includes
Shannon, Philip John - located at Herne Bay, Auckland.
The 3rd share allocation (34 shares, 34%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Robinson, Michael Julius, located at Freemans Bay, Auckland (a director). Nh Trustees No.8 Limited has been categorised as "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965).
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 03 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 33 | |||
Director | Stirling, John |
Campbells Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
10 Jun 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 33 | |||
Director | Shannon, Philip John |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
10 Jun 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 34 | |||
Director | Robinson, Michael Julius |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
02 Jul 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Newdick, Michael Otway |
Milford Auckland 0620 New Zealand |
02 Jul 2013 - 10 Jun 2024 |
John Stirling - Director
Appointment date: 02 Jul 2013
Address: Campbells Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Apr 2020
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Jul 2013
Michael Julius Robinson - Director
Appointment date: 02 Jul 2013
Address: Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Jul 2013
Philip John Shannon - Director
Appointment date: 05 Aug 2019
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Apr 2020
Address: Wilton, Wellington, 6012 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Aug 2019
Samuel James Ames - Director
Appointment date: 10 Jun 2024
Address: Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Jun 2024
Michael Otway Newdick - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Jul 2013
Termination date: 21 May 2024
Address: Milford, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Apr 2020
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2014
Endow Nominees Limited
400 Lake Road
Endow Limited
400 Lake Road
Nh Trustees No.7 Limited
400 Lake Road
Nh Trustees No.6 Limited
400 Lake Road
Nh Trustees No.5 Limited
400 Lake Road
Nh Trustees No.4 Limited
400 Lake Road
Nh Trustees No.1 Limited
400 Lake Road
Nh Trustees No.3 Limited
400 Lake Road
Nh Trustees No.7 Limited
400 Lake Road
North Harbour Trustee Company (2011) Limited
400 Lake Road
Phil Winters Trustees Limited
400 Lake Road
Ungasan Trustees Limited
400 Lake Road