New Zealand Soft Golden Limited was started on 20 May 2013 and issued a number of 9429030225589. The registered LTD company has been managed by 5 directors: Yixiaoke Pang - an active director whose contract started on 26 Oct 2021,
Cheng Chen - an active director whose contract started on 26 Oct 2021,
Yang Zhao - an inactive director whose contract started on 04 Feb 2021 and was terminated on 08 Nov 2021,
Cheng Chen - an inactive director whose contract started on 07 Jun 2016 and was terminated on 01 Feb 2021,
Yixiaoke Pang - an inactive director whose contract started on 20 May 2013 and was terminated on 20 Jan 2021.
As stated in our database (last updated on 16 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: 352 Church Street, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 (category: registered, service).
Until 27 Apr 2023, New Zealand Soft Golden Limited had been using 12 Patrick Street, Onehunga, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 groups (4 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 50 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Pang, Yixiaoke (an individual) located at West Harbour, Auckland postcode 0618,
Yixiaoke Pang (a director) located at Onehunga, Auckland postcode 1061.
The second group consists of 2 shareholders, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Chen, Cheng - located at West Harbour, Auckland,
Cheng Chen - located at Onehunga, Auckland. New Zealand Soft Golden Limited was classified as "Wholesale trade nec" (business classification F373970).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 352 Church Street, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 27 Apr 2023
Principal place of activity
12 Patrick Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 12 Patrick Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 13 Mar 2017 to 27 Apr 2023
Address #2: 562 Don Buck Road,, Westgate, Auckland, 0614 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 24 Feb 2016 to 13 Mar 2017
Address #3: 3b/36, Liverpool St, Auckland Central, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 30 Sep 2014 to 24 Feb 2016
Address #4: 36, Botanic View, The Gardens, Auckland, 2105 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Mar 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
Address #5: 1552c, Dominion Rd Extension, Mt Roskill, Auckland, 1041 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 May 2013 to 05 Mar 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 10 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Pang, Yixiaoke |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 New Zealand |
26 Oct 2021 - |
Director | Yixiaoke Pang |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 New Zealand |
20 May 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Chen, Cheng |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 New Zealand |
26 Oct 2021 - |
Director | Cheng Chen |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Pang, Yixiaoke |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 New Zealand |
20 May 2013 - 03 Feb 2021 |
Individual | Fu, Xiang |
Wu Han ,hu Bei China |
04 Dec 2018 - 17 Oct 2022 |
Individual | Zhao, Yang |
Blockhouse Bay Auckland 0600 New Zealand |
03 Feb 2021 - 26 Oct 2021 |
Individual | Chen, Cheng |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2016 - 03 Feb 2021 |
Yixiaoke Pang - Director
Appointment date: 26 Oct 2021
Address: West Harbour, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Oct 2021
Cheng Chen - Director
Appointment date: 26 Oct 2021
Address: West Harbour, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Oct 2021
Yang Zhao - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Feb 2021
Termination date: 08 Nov 2021
Address: Blockhouse Bay, Auckland, 0600 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Feb 2021
Cheng Chen - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Jun 2016
Termination date: 01 Feb 2021
Address: Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Mar 2017
Yixiaoke Pang - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 May 2013
Termination date: 20 Jan 2021
Address: Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Mar 2017
Nzsg Home Textile Limited
12 Patrick Street
Chain On Immigration Services Limited
293a Church Street
Nicholson Family Trustees Limited
293a Church Street
Mckean, Carnell & Associates Limited
17 Patrick Street
Castle Publishing Limited
297a Church Street
Canterbury Television Network Limited
297a Church Street
Abc Packaging International Limited
5/298 Neilson St
Bremick Nz Limited
Unit D / 373 Neilson Street
Flooring & Tile Design Limited
Suite 1, 390 Neilson Street
Grand & Pure Trading Limited
320 Church Street Onehunga
Grossman Agencies Limited
343 Church Street
New Zealand Wine Export Centre Limited
2 Goodman Place