D N M Painting & Decorating Limited was registered on 03 May 2013 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429030240544. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Dean Frederick Hoyes - an active director whose contract began on 03 May 2013,
Wei-Chun Hung - an inactive director whose contract began on 03 May 2013 and was terminated on 14 Aug 2013.
According to BizDb's data (updated on 21 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 155 East Belt, Rangiora, 7400 (type: registered, physical).
Until 21 May 2021, D N M Painting & Decorating Limited had been using 2 John Leith Place, Rd 1, Amberley as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Hoyes, Dean Frederick (a director) located at Rangiora postcode 7400. D N M Painting & Decorating Limited was categorised as "Painting of buildings or other structures" (ANZSIC E324420).
Principal place of activity
10 Glenavon Place, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 2 John Leith Place, Rd 1, Amberley, 7481 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 23 Jun 2017 to 21 May 2021
Address: 60 Grays Road, Yaldhurst, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Apr 2016 to 23 Jun 2017
Address: 10 Glenavon Place, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 10 Jun 2015 to 05 Apr 2016
Address: 405 Avonhead Road, Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 11 Jun 2013 to 10 Jun 2015
Address: 121a Merivale Lane, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 03 May 2013 to 11 Jun 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 03 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Hoyes, Dean Frederick |
Rangiora 7400 New Zealand |
03 May 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Wei-chun Hung |
Merivale Christchurch 8014 New Zealand |
03 May 2013 - 14 Aug 2013 |
Individual | Hung, Wei-chun |
Merivale Christchurch 8014 New Zealand |
03 May 2013 - 14 Aug 2013 |
Dean Frederick Hoyes - Director
Appointment date: 03 May 2013
Address: Rangiora, 7400 New Zealand
Address used since 13 May 2021
Address: Rd 1, Leithfield, 7481 New Zealand
Address used since 01 May 2018
Address: Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Jun 2015
Wei-chun Hung - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 May 2013
Termination date: 14 Aug 2013
Address: Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Address used since 03 May 2013
Benjaroung Limited
1 Glenavon Place
Rubber Plus Limited
20 Camelot Street
Cathjun Limited
31 Wentworth Street
Paphol Limited
31 Wentworth Street
Cathedral Junction Utilities Limited
31 Wentworth Street
Stn Enterprise Limited
42 Hounslow Street
Consol Construction Solutions Limited
223 Memorial Avenue
Excellent Reputation Professional Decoration Limited
172a Waimairi Road
George Welch Builders (2014) Limited
Level 1, 567 Wairakei Road
Kelvin Smyth Limited
222 Memorial Avenue
Simple Trust Group Limited
15 Staveley Street
Wall Decor Limited
18 Greendale Avenue