Travelmore International Tour Limited was started on 08 Feb 2013 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429030354340. The registered LTD company has been run by 4 directors: Youzhi You - an active director whose contract started on 08 Feb 2013,
Jenny Jiang - an active director whose contract started on 08 Feb 2013,
Charles You - an active director whose contract started on 08 Feb 2013,
Qing Fei Jiang - an active director whose contract started on 08 Feb 2013.
According to our data (last updated on 18 Sep 2024), the company filed 1 address: Po Box118, Shortland Street, Auckland, 1040 (category: postal, office).
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
You, Youzhi (a director) located at Auckland postcode 1040.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Jiang, Qing Fei - located at Blundell Place, Birkenhead, Auckland. Travelmore International Tour Limited has been categorised as "Booking service (passenger transport and/or accommodation)" (business classification N722010).
Principal place of activity
Level3,18 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1040 New Zealand
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 05 Sep 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | You, Youzhi |
Auckland 1040 New Zealand |
02 Jun 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Jiang, Qing Fei |
Blundell Place, Birkenhead Auckland 1040 New Zealand |
29 Jan 2020 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | You, Charles |
Auckland 1040 New Zealand |
16 Jun 2020 - 02 Jun 2021 |
Director | Jiang, Jenny |
Blundell Place, Birkenhead Auckland 1040 New Zealand |
08 Feb 2013 - 29 Jan 2020 |
Youzhi You - Director
Appointment date: 08 Feb 2013
Address: Auckland, 1040 New Zealand
Jenny Jiang - Director
Appointment date: 08 Feb 2013
Address: Blundell Place, Birkenhead, Auckland, 1040 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Feb 2013
Charles You - Director
Appointment date: 08 Feb 2013
Address: Auckland, 1040 New Zealand
Qing Fei Jiang - Director
Appointment date: 08 Feb 2013
Address: Blundell Place, Birkenhead, Auckland, 1040 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Feb 2013
Yee Chan Family Trustee Limited
C/o Forest Harrison
Darby Capital Investments Limited Partnership
Brown Partners Lawyers
Darby Financing Limited Partnership
Brown Partners Lawyers
Soho Basin Developments Lp
Brown Partners Lawyers
Parkins Bay Preserve Capital Lp
Brown Partners Lawyers
Corporate Accommodation New Zealand Limited
Apartment 3003, 1 Courthouse Lane
Corporate Apartments Auckland Limited
Apartment 3003, 1 Courthouse Lane
Corporate Apartments Nz Limited
Apartment 3003 Metropolis
Gulliver's Pacific Limited
Staples Rodway Ltd
Nz Anran Coach Limited
18 Shortland Street
Pacific Leisure Group Limited
Level 9 Sap Tower