Pay Attention Limited was incorporated on 07 Dec 2012 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030442290. This registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Gregory John Paterson - an active director whose contract began on 07 Dec 2012,
Lauchlan Andrew Chisholm - an active director whose contract began on 07 Dec 2012.
As stated in our data (updated on 18 Jul 2024), the company registered 1 address: 67 Princes Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (type: registered, physical).
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 4 groups (5 shareholders in total). In the first group, 499 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Chisholm, Lauchlan Andrew (a director) located at Dunedin Central, Dunedin postcode 9016,
Guest Carter Trustees Limited (an entity) located at 248 Cumberland Street, Dunedin postcode 9016.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 49.9% shares (exactly 499 shares) and includes
Fawn Holdings Limited - located at Dunedin Central, Dunedin.
The third share allotment (1 share, 0.1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Chisholm, Lauchlan Andrew, located at Dunedin Central, Dunedin (a director).
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 15 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 499 | |||
Director | Chisholm, Lauchlan Andrew |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 New Zealand |
07 Dec 2012 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Guest Carter Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042370864 |
248 Cumberland Street Dunedin 9016 New Zealand |
28 Jul 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 499 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Fawn Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030425064 |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 New Zealand |
07 Dec 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Chisholm, Lauchlan Andrew |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 New Zealand |
07 Dec 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Paterson, Gregory John |
Vauxhall Dunedin 9013 New Zealand |
07 Dec 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Sycamore, Tony Jason |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 New Zealand |
18 Jun 2018 - 28 Jul 2021 |
Entity | Albert Alloo & Sons Trustee Company (2010) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031700986 Company Number: 2387650 |
67 Princes Street Dunedin New Zealand |
07 Dec 2012 - 18 Jun 2018 |
Entity | Albert Alloo & Sons Trustee Company (2010) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031700986 Company Number: 2387650 |
67 Princes Street Dunedin New Zealand |
07 Dec 2012 - 18 Jun 2018 |
Gregory John Paterson - Director
Appointment date: 07 Dec 2012
Address: Vauxhall, Dunedin, 9013 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Dec 2012
Lauchlan Andrew Chisholm - Director
Appointment date: 07 Dec 2012
Address: Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Dec 2012
Spring Grove Land Limited
67 Princes Street
Albert Alloo & Sons Trustee Company (2011) Limited
67 Princes Street
Rotunda Limited
67 Princes Street
Distinctive Living Limited
67 Princes Street
Albert Alloo & Sons Trustee Company (2013) Limited
67 Princes Street
Fawn Holdings Limited
67 Princes Street