Completeview Software Limited was started on 12 Nov 2012 and issued a number of 9429030443716. This registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Jennifer Mary Miller - an active director whose contract started on 12 Nov 2012,
Alexander Paul Miller - an active director whose contract started on 12 Nov 2012.
According to our database (updated on 22 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 37 Mont Le Grand Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 (type: office, physical).
Up until 15 Mar 2016, Completeview Software Limited had been using 1 Cleveland Road, Parnell, Auckland as their physical address.
BizDb identified previous aliases for the company: from 15 Oct 2014 to 11 Nov 2015 they were named Insightful Mobility Limited, from 12 Nov 2012 to 15 Oct 2014 they were named Completeview Consulting Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Miller, Jennifer Mary (a director) located at Mount Eden, Auckland postcode 1024.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Miller, Alexander Paul - located at Mount Eden, Auckland. Completeview Software Limited has been classified as "Computer consultancy service" (ANZSIC M700010).
Principal place of activity
1 Cleveland Road, Suite 2.13, Axis Bldg C/o The Business, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 1 Cleveland Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 10 Jul 2015 to 15 Mar 2016
Address #2: Level 9, 175 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered address used from 23 Oct 2014 to 10 Jul 2015
Address #3: 37 Mont Le Grand Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Registered address used from 12 Nov 2012 to 23 Oct 2014
Address #4: 37 Mont Le Grand Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Physical address used from 12 Nov 2012 to 10 Jul 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 25 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Miller, Jennifer Mary |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
12 Nov 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Miller, Alexander Paul |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
12 Nov 2012 - |
Jennifer Mary Miller - Director
Appointment date: 12 Nov 2012
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Nov 2012
Alexander Paul Miller - Director
Appointment date: 12 Nov 2012
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Nov 2012
Orb Medical Limited
Unit 9, Level 2, The Axis Building
Challenger Brands Limited
Suite 9, Level 2, Axis Building
Turin Panel And Paint Limited
Suite 9, Level 2, Axis Building
Coastal R & R Limited
Suite 9, Level 2, Axis Building
Igl Properties Limited
Suite 9, Level 2, Axis Building
Blaikie Ft Properties Limited
Suite 9, Level 2, Axis Building
Action It Limited
Unit 18 11 Faraday Street
Electronpowered Limited
Unit 6, 7 Cleveland Road
Network Service Providers Limited
Unit 1, 13 Farnham Street
Provex Limited
Flat 15, 7 Cleveland Road
Topquality Limited
Suite 3280, 17b Farnham Street
Virtuelle Group Limited
Suite 5621