Iq Squared Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 31 Oct 2012. 9429030502420 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Business consultant service" (business classification M696205) is how the company has been categorised. The company has been supervised by 4 directors: Richard Gordon Kirkland - an active director whose contract began on 25 Sep 2014,
Adam Hunt - an inactive director whose contract began on 25 Sep 2014 and was terminated on 07 Oct 2016,
Nicholas Noel Rowney - an inactive director whose contract began on 25 Jul 2013 and was terminated on 26 Sep 2014,
Ian Robert Fitzgerald - an inactive director whose contract began on 31 Oct 2012 and was terminated on 25 Sep 2013.
Last updated on 26 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 4 addresses this company registered, namely: Po Box 25583, Wellington, 6140 (postal address),
50 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 (office address),
50 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 (delivery address),
50 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 (physical address) among others.
Iq Squared Limited had been using 171 Featherston Street, Wellington Central, Wellington as their registered address until 09 May 2018.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Kirkland, Richard Gordon - located at 6140, Rd 1, Greytown.
Other active addresses
Address #4: 50 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Office & delivery address used from 03 Oct 2019
Principal place of activity
171 Featherston Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 171 Featherston Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Sep 2014 to 09 May 2018
Address #2: 214 Main Street, Greytown, 5712 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 02 Aug 2013 to 26 Sep 2014
Address #3: 28 Mills Road, Brooklyn, Wellington, 6120 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 31 Oct 2012 to 02 Aug 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 30 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Kirkland, Richard Gordon |
Rd 1 Greytown 5794 New Zealand |
16 Jun 2015 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Rowlands, Lorraine |
Brooklyn Wellington 6120 New Zealand |
31 Oct 2012 - 25 Jul 2013 |
Individual | Rowney, Nicholas Noel |
Brooklyn Wellington 6120 New Zealand |
31 Oct 2012 - 25 Jul 2013 |
Entity | Clavis Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032144147 Company Number: 2282599 |
16 Jun 2015 - 24 Aug 2016 | |
Other | Risk & Regulation | 08 Aug 2014 - 16 Jun 2015 | |
Individual | Kirkland, Richard Gordon |
Greytown 5712 New Zealand |
25 Jul 2013 - 08 Aug 2014 |
Other | Null - Risk & Regulation | 08 Aug 2014 - 16 Jun 2015 | |
Entity | Clavis Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032144147 Company Number: 2282599 |
16 Jun 2015 - 24 Aug 2016 |
Richard Gordon Kirkland - Director
Appointment date: 25 Sep 2014
Address: Rd 1, Greytown, 5794 New Zealand
Address used since 30 May 2016
Adam Hunt - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Sep 2014
Termination date: 07 Oct 2016
Address: Surfdale, Waiheke Island, 1081 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Sep 2014
Nicholas Noel Rowney - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Jul 2013
Termination date: 26 Sep 2014
Address: Brooklyn, Wellington, 6120 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Jul 2013
Ian Robert Fitzgerald - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Oct 2012
Termination date: 25 Sep 2013
Address: Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Oct 2012
Cameron Partners Capital Limited
Level 12 Hp Tower
Comet Ridge Nz Pty Ltd
171 Featherston Street
Jarden Partners Limited
Level 14
Jarden Investments Limited
Level 14
Jarden Group Limited
Level 14
Harbour Asset Management Limited
Level 16
Advanced Methods Group Limited
50 Customhouse Quay
Bitsolid Limited
H P Tower, Level 15
Brown Copeland & Co Limited
Level 16
Il Falcone Investments Limited
50 Customhouse Quay
Linchpin Consulting Group Limited
Level 15, Hp Tower
Pcworkz Services Limited
50 Customhouse Quay