Fifo Capital International Limited, a registered company, was registered on 30 May 2012. 9429030648302 is the NZBN it was issued. "Financial service nec" (ANZSIC K641915) is how the company was classified. The company has been run by 2 directors: Nigel Randal Thomson - an active director whose contract started on 30 May 2012,
Lena Thomson - an active director whose contract started on 30 May 2012.
Updated on 10 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 4 addresses this company registered, specifically: Level 14, 88 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (physical address),
Level 14, 88 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (service address),
Level 14, 88 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (registered address),
137375, Parnell, Auckland, 1151 (postal address) among others.
Fifo Capital International Limited had been using Level 7, 53 Fort Street, Auckland as their physical address until 30 Mar 2022.
Old names for this company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 28 May 2012 to 26 Nov 2013 they were named Wishart Road Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 50 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%).
Other active addresses
Address #4: Level 14, 88 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & service address used from 30 Mar 2022
Principal place of activity
Suite 1, 86 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 7, 53 Fort Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical address used from 30 Apr 2019 to 30 Mar 2022
Address #2: Level 7, 53 Fort Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered address used from 30 Apr 2019 to 01 Mar 2022
Address #3: Level 1, 33 Great South Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 Mar 2018 to 30 Apr 2019
Address #4: Suite 2, 170 Parnell Road,, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 29 Jan 2016 to 20 Mar 2018
Address #5: 168 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 30 May 2012 to 29 Jan 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 09 Jul 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Thomson, Nigel Randal |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
30 May 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Thomson, Lena |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
30 May 2012 - |
Nigel Randal Thomson - Director
Appointment date: 30 May 2012
Address: Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Jun 2020
Address: Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Address used since 30 May 2012
Lena Thomson - Director
Appointment date: 30 May 2012
Address: Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Jun 2020
Address: Parnell, Auckland, 1151 New Zealand
Address used since 30 May 2012
Fleetcor Technologies New Zealand Limited
Level 5, Building 2, 666 Great South Road
Cff Limited
Building 2 Level 1 195 Main Highway
Skellerup Industrial Holdings Limited
Level 3, 205 Great South Road
Skellerup Agri Holdings Limited
Level 3, 205 Great South Road
We2 Jv Limited
Building 2 Level 1 195 Main Highway
Prm Health Limited
Level 3, 7 Ellerslie Racecourse Dr
Centurion Finance Limited
600 Great South Road
Credsol Business Services Limited
586 Great South Road
Credsol Financial Services Limited
586
Epayments Limited
Suite3, Level 6, 300 Queen Street
Rtt Capital Limited
7 Derry Street
Saturn Portfolio Management Limited
Level 10, 57-59 Fort Street