Kiwi Waste Disposal Limited was launched on 21 Mar 2012 and issued a number of 9429030740907. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Ryan Joseph Moloney - an active director whose contract started on 21 Mar 2012,
Heidi Jayne Moloney - an inactive director whose contract started on 15 Jan 2013 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2014.
According to BizDb's database (last updated on 26 Aug 2024), this company uses 1 address: 55A Mclean Road, Rd 3, Whakatane, 3193 (types include: registered, physical).
Until 02 Mar 2021, Kiwi Waste Disposal Limited had been using 30 Liverpool Street, Kawerau, Kawerau as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (3 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 98 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Moloney, Ryan Joseph (a director) located at Rd 2, Whakatane postcode 3192,
Fca Trustees 2012 Limited (an entity) located at Whakatane, Whakatane postcode 3120.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 2% shares (exactly 2 shares) and includes
Moloney, Ryan Joseph - located at Rd 2, Whakatane. Kiwi Waste Disposal Limited has been classified as "Waste disposal service" (business classification D292140).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 30 Liverpool Street, Kawerau, Kawerau, 3127 New Zealand
Registered address used from 25 Mar 2019 to 02 Mar 2021
Address #2: 30 Liverpool Street, Kawerau, Kawerau, 3127 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 27 Aug 2015 to 25 Mar 2019
Address #3: 12 Jellicoe Court, Kawerau, Kawerau, 3127 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 18 Aug 2015 to 27 Aug 2015
Address #4: 71 Mcalister Street, Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 Aug 2013 to 18 Aug 2015
Address #5: Cnr Pyne & Mcalister Streets, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 21 Mar 2012 to 20 Aug 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 06 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 98 | |||
Director | Moloney, Ryan Joseph |
Rd 2 Whakatane 3192 New Zealand |
21 Mar 2012 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Fca Trustees 2012 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033292090 |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 New Zealand |
30 Oct 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 2 | |||
Director | Moloney, Ryan Joseph |
Rd 2 Whakatane 3192 New Zealand |
21 Mar 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Moloney, Heidi Jayne |
Rd 2 Whakatane 3192 New Zealand |
21 Mar 2012 - 17 Feb 2015 |
Entity | Gta Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035454649 Company Number: 1502085 |
21 Mar 2012 - 30 Oct 2014 | |
Entity | Gta Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035454649 Company Number: 1502085 |
21 Mar 2012 - 30 Oct 2014 |
Ryan Joseph Moloney - Director
Appointment date: 21 Mar 2012
Address: Rd 2, Whakatane, 3192 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Jan 2013
Heidi Jayne Moloney - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Jan 2013
Termination date: 01 Apr 2014
Address: Rd 2, Whakatane, 3192 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Jan 2013
The Manic Room Limited
19-21 Liverpool Street
Ibbi Holdings Limited
19-21 Liverpool Street
Auto Electrical Services 1991 Limited
42 Liverpoll Street
Pacific View Investments Limited
5a Liverpool Street
Mayclair Holdings Limited
5a Liverpool Street
Jarrah Park Holdings Limited
5a Liverpool Street
3 R Group Limited
C/o Oldershaw & Co.
Eco Garden Bags Limited
26 Fourth Avenue
Faraway Downs Developments Limited
5 Richardson Street
Intergrated Systems Engineers Limited
10 Fairview Street
Logistics Solutions (nz) Limited
32 Bolton Road
Puahue Investments Limited
195 Mahoe Street