Hg (Auckland) Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 16 Mar 2012. 9429030746480 is the NZBN it was issued. "Rental of residential property" (ANZSIC L671160) is how the company was classified. This company has been supervised by 3 directors: Alistair James Gauld - an active director whose contract started on 16 Mar 2012,
Brian James Gauld - an inactive director whose contract started on 26 Mar 2014 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2016,
Nicola Karen D'almeida - an inactive director whose contract started on 16 Mar 2012 and was terminated on 26 Mar 2014.
Updated on 27 Feb 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 (type: registered, physical).
Hg (Auckland) Limited had been using Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive, Burswood, Manukau as their registered address until 30 Jul 2014.
Past names used by this company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 05 May 2016 to 17 Mar 2020 they were called Harts Gauld Limited, from 11 Apr 2014 to 05 May 2016 they were called Flamekeeper Limited and from 15 Mar 2012 to 11 Apr 2014 they were called Hallmark Kennels (Auckland) Limited.
A total of 25000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 16500 shares (66%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which includes 2 shareholders in control of 8500 shares (34%).
Previous address
Address: Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive, Burswood, Manukau, 2013 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Mar 2012 to 30 Jul 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 25000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 02 Nov 2021
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 16500 | |||
Director | Gauld, Alistair James |
Rd 2 Papakura 2582 New Zealand |
23 May 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 8500 | |||
Individual | Miller, Peter David Romeril |
Mellons Bay Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
23 May 2016 - |
Director | Gauld, Alistair James |
Rd 2 Papakura 2582 New Zealand |
23 May 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Gauld, Alistair James |
Rd 2 Papakura 2582 New Zealand |
16 Mar 2012 - 08 May 2014 |
Individual | D'almeida, Nicola Karen |
Rd 2 Papakura 2582 New Zealand |
16 Mar 2012 - 08 May 2014 |
Entity | Bjg Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030724884 Company Number: 3766412 |
08 May 2014 - 23 May 2016 | |
Entity | Bjg Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030724884 Company Number: 3766412 |
08 May 2014 - 23 May 2016 | |
Director | Nicola Karen D'almeida |
Rd 2 Papakura 2582 New Zealand |
16 Mar 2012 - 08 May 2014 |
Alistair James Gauld - Director
Appointment date: 16 Mar 2012
Address: Rd 2, Papakura, 2582 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Mar 2012
Brian James Gauld - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Mar 2014
Termination date: 01 Apr 2016
Address: Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Mar 2014
Nicola Karen D'almeida - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Mar 2012
Termination date: 26 Mar 2014
Address: Rd 2, Papakura, 2582 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Mar 2012
R & R Quality Products Limited
Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive
Flowerpak 2005 Limited
Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive
Fresh To Go Limited
Level 2, 116 Harris Road
Spraggon Marketing Limited
Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive
Nz Good Food Co. Limited
Level 2, Bdo House, 116 Harris Road,
Elite Garage Doors Limited
Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive
Alicante Rentals Limited
Level 2, Building 5, 60 Highbrook Drive
Dlorah Limited
Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive
Mairis Limited
Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive
Paitai Holdings Limited
Unit 5, Level 1, 15 Accent Drive
Rapi Investments Limited
Level 2, 116 Harris Road
Tauamcmaster Holdings Limited
Level 2, Building 5, 60 Highbrook Drive