Phillips' Mobile Mechanic Limited was registered on 25 Jan 2012 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030813052. This removed LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Kea Phillips - an active director whose contract started on 20 Jan 2015,
Max Malcolm Cottle - an inactive director whose contract started on 25 Jan 2012 and was terminated on 29 Jan 2015.
As stated in BizDb's data (updated on 29 Jul 2024), the company uses 1 address: 71 Delaney Drive, Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt, 5019 (types include: physical, registered).
Up to 27 Feb 2017, Phillips' Mobile Mechanic Limited had been using 51 Arawa Street, Matamata as their registered address.
BizDb identified former names used by the company: from 10 Jul 2013 to 10 Feb 2015 they were named Total Package Cleaners Limited, from 25 Jan 2012 to 10 Jul 2013 they were named Auto Detailers Limited.
A total of 1200 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 600 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Phillips, Kea (an individual) located at Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt postcode 5019.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 600 shares) and includes
Phillips, Daniel William - located at Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt. Phillips' Mobile Mechanic Limited is classified as "Automotive servicing - general mechanical repairs" (ANZSIC S941910).
Previous address
Address: 51 Arawa Street, Matamata, 3440 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 25 Jan 2012 to 27 Feb 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1200
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 06 Aug 2021
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 600 | |||
Individual | Phillips, Kea |
Stokes Valley Lower Hutt 5019 New Zealand |
29 Jan 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 600 | |||
Individual | Phillips, Daniel William |
Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt 5019 New Zealand |
18 Feb 2017 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Max Malcolm Cottle |
Eltham Eltham 4322 New Zealand |
25 Jan 2012 - 29 Jan 2015 |
Individual | Cottle, Max Malcolm |
Eltham Eltham 4322 New Zealand |
25 Jan 2012 - 29 Jan 2015 |
Kea Phillips - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2015
Address: Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt, 5019 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Feb 2017
Max Malcolm Cottle - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Jan 2012
Termination date: 29 Jan 2015
Address: Eltham, Eltham, 4322 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Jun 2014
Cleaning Services New Zealand Limited
36 Shackleton Grove
Federation Of New Zealand Netherlands Societies Incorporated
C/o Federation Secretary
Millar Design Limited
36 August Street
Infinity Solutions Limited
17 Rintoul Grove
Infitel Solutions Limited
17 Rintoul Grove
Te Takere O Aotea Cultural Club Trust
9 Thomson Grove
All Fleet Services Limited
136 Eastern Hutt Road
Cwl (2014) Limited
164 Eastern Hutt Road
Industrial Equipment Servicing & Repairs Limited
67 Colson St
K.w Auto Service Limited
Unit 8, 80 Eastern Hutt Road
Taita Auto Repairs Limited
1217 High Street
Waiwhetu Auto Services Limited
245 Stokes Valley Road