Fianz Holdings Limited was launched on 10 Aug 2011 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030987432. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 11 directors: Ibrar Ahmad Sheikh - an active director whose contract began on 04 Jun 2015,
Umarji Mohammed - an active director whose contract began on 01 Sep 2018,
Shameel Riaz Sahib - an active director whose contract began on 01 Apr 2024,
Mohammed Zabid Iqbal Khan - an active director whose contract began on 01 Apr 2024,
Abdirizak Abdirehman Abdi - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Jul 2021 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2024.
As stated in BizDb's data (updated on 19 Jul 2024), this company filed 1 address: 463 Porchester Road, Randwick Park, Auckland, 2105 (category: service, registered).
Until 14 Jun 2024, Fianz Holdings Limited had been using 463 Porchester Road, Randwick Park, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Federation Of Islamic Associations Of New Zealand (an other) located at Lyall Bay, Wellington postcode 6022. Fianz Holdings Limited was classified as "Community based multifunctional activity nec" (ANZSIC S955940).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 463 Porchester Road, Randwick Park, Auckland, 2105 New Zealand
Registered address used from 14 Jun 2024
Address #5: 463 Porchester Road, Randwick Park, Auckland, 2105 New Zealand
Service address used from 03 Jul 2024
Principal place of activity
7-11 Queens Drive, Lyall Bay, Wellington, 6241 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 463 Porchester Road, Randwick Park, Auckland, 2105 New Zealand
Registered address used from 22 Jul 2022 to 14 Jun 2024
Address #2: 463 Porchester Rd, Ardmore, Auckland, 2105 New Zealand
Registered address used from 05 Aug 2021 to 22 Jul 2022
Address #3: 463 Porchester Rd, Ardmore, Auckland, 2105 New Zealand
Physical address used from 05 Aug 2021 to 21 Jul 2022
Address #4: 7-11 Queens Drive, Kilbirnie, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 30 May 2017 to 05 Aug 2021
Address #5: 7-11 Queens Drive, Lyall Bay, Wellington, 6140 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 May 2013 to 30 May 2017
Address #6: 131 Redoubt Road, Goodwood Heights, Auckland, 2105 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 10 Aug 2011 to 17 May 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 04 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Other (Other) | Federation Of Islamic Associations Of New Zealand |
Lyall Bay Wellington 6022 New Zealand |
26 Apr 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mohammed, Umarji |
Goodwood Heights Auckland 2105 New Zealand |
10 Aug 2011 - 26 Apr 2012 |
Director | Umarji Mohammed |
Goodwood Heights Auckland 2105 New Zealand |
10 Aug 2011 - 26 Apr 2012 |
Ibrar Ahmad Sheikh - Director
Appointment date: 04 Jun 2015
Address: Mangere, Auckland, 2022 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Jun 2015
Umarji Mohammed - Director
Appointment date: 01 Sep 2018
Address: Manurewa, Auckland, 2105 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Jul 2024
Address: The Gardens , Manurewa, Auckland, 2105 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Jun 2023
Address: Randwick Park, Auckland, 2105 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jul 2021
Address: Goodwood Heights, Auckland, 2105 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2018
Shameel Riaz Sahib - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2024
Address: Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2024
Mohammed Zabid Iqbal Khan - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2024
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2024
Abdirizak Abdirehman Abdi - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2021
Termination date: 01 Apr 2024
Address: Fairview Downs, Hamilton, 3214 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2021
Mustafa Mohammed Farouk - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Sep 2018
Termination date: 01 Jul 2021
Address: Huntington, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Sep 2018
Umarji Mohammed - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Aug 2011
Termination date: 01 Aug 2018
Address: Goodwood Heights, Auckland, 2105 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Aug 2011
Hazim Ziad Kamel Arafeh - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Jun 2015
Termination date: 01 Aug 2018
Address: Fitzherbert, Palmerston North, 4410 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Jun 2015
Anwar Ghani - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 May 2012
Termination date: 04 Jun 2015
Address: Hillcrest, Hamilton, 3216 New Zealand
Address used since 21 May 2012
Jamaal Anthony Green - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Aug 2013
Termination date: 04 Jun 2015
Address: Hillsborough, Christchurch, 8022 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Aug 2013
Muhammad Musa - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 May 2012
Termination date: 01 Jun 2013
Address: Hornby, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 21 May 2012
Federation Of Islamic Associations Of New Zealand Incorporated
7-11 Queens Drive
Smg Developments Limited
19 Cruickshank Street
Ao Projects Limited
2a Queens Drive
Ocean Limited
59 Bay Road
Carrera Software Limited
50 Childers Terrace
Jrh Tutoring Limited
38 Coutts Street
Aiorangi Limited
Flat 2, 30 London Road
Conversations On Life Limited
Unit 3, 10 Angus Avenue
Idcare Limited
Level 15, 171 Featherston Street
Sarah Doherty Limited
21a Chelmsford Street
Suburban Limited
31 Abbott Street
Zeli Limited
77 South Karori Road