Stey Holdings Limited was started on 12 Aug 2011 and issued an NZ business number of 9429030989283. This registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Aubrey Stephen Davies - an active director whose contract began on 12 Aug 2011,
Alistair Evan Rhys Davies - an inactive director whose contract began on 04 May 2012 and was terminated on 08 Mar 2016,
Thomas David Waterer - an inactive director whose contract began on 12 Aug 2011 and was terminated on 08 May 2012.
As stated in our database (updated on 15 Jul 2024), the company registered 1 address: 4Th Floor, Smith & Caughey Building, 253 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 (category: physical, registered).
Up until 18 Apr 2018, Stey Holdings Limited had been using 4Th Floor, Smith & Caughey Building, 253 Queen Street, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Davies, Aubrey Stephen (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050,
Davies, Yvette Miriam (an individual) located at St Heliers, Auckland postcode 1071. Stey Holdings Limited is categorised as "Rental of commercial property" (ANZSIC L671250).
Previous address
Address: 4th Floor, Smith & Caughey Building, 253 Queen Street, Auckland, 1141 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Aug 2011 to 18 Apr 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 29 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Davies, Aubrey Stephen |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
12 Aug 2011 - |
Individual | Davies, Yvette Miriam |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
12 Aug 2011 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Davies, Geneth Isobel |
Hokowhitu Palmerston North 4410 New Zealand |
16 May 2012 - 02 Sep 2016 |
Individual | Davies, Alistair Evan Rhys |
Hokowhitu Palmerston North 4410 New Zealand |
16 May 2012 - 02 Sep 2016 |
Individual | Waterer, Thomas David |
Mellons Bay Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
12 Aug 2011 - 16 May 2012 |
Individual | Waterer, Eileen Karyn |
Mellons Bay Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
12 Aug 2011 - 16 May 2012 |
Director | Thomas David Waterer |
Mellons Bay Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
12 Aug 2011 - 16 May 2012 |
Aubrey Stephen Davies - Director
Appointment date: 12 Aug 2011
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Aug 2011
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Apr 2018
Alistair Evan Rhys Davies - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 May 2012
Termination date: 08 Mar 2016
Address: Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410 New Zealand
Address used since 04 May 2012
Thomas David Waterer - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Aug 2011
Termination date: 08 May 2012
Address: Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Aug 2011
Service Dynamics Limited
4th Floor
Qin Family Trustee Limited
4th Floor
Sdi Holdings Limited
4th Floor Smith & Caughey Bldg
Swan Railley Architects (australasia) Limited
7th Floor
Vifx Systems Limited
Smith And Caughey's Building
Zanj Limited
Level 4
Arns Trustees Limited
Level 1 79 Gaunt Street
Cintrol Property Services Limited
4th Floor, 253 Queen Street
Ngk Pty Limited
Leve 4
Nty Nz Pte Limited
Suite 4, 290 Queen Street
Sun Aohua Nz Limited
4th Floor
Sun Xing Ye Property Management Limited
4th Floor