Npf Consulting Limited was started on 06 May 2011 and issued an NZ business number of 9429031105521. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 4 directors: Jill Mary Irene Fagerlund - an active director whose contract began on 16 Jun 2011,
Neville Petrie Fagerlund - an active director whose contract began on 22 Nov 2012,
Llyween Janet Delves Couper - an inactive director whose contract began on 16 Jun 2011 and was terminated on 22 Nov 2012,
Neville Fagerlund - an inactive director whose contract began on 06 May 2011 and was terminated on 22 Jun 2011.
As stated in our database (last updated on 01 Sep 2024), the company uses 2 addresses: 16 Banks Avenue, Burwood, Christchurch, 8061 (office address),
16 Banks Ave, Burwood, Christchurch, 8061 (physical address),
16 Banks Ave, Burwood, Christchurch, 8061 (registered address),
16 Banks Ave, Burwood, Christchurch, 8061 (service address) among others.
Up until 02 Mar 2016, Npf Consulting Limited had been using Level 1, 567 Wairakei Road, Burnside, Christchurch as their physical address.
BizDb found past names for the company: from 06 May 2011 to 22 Nov 2012 they were called The Learning Team Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 500 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Fagerlund, Jill Mary Irene (a director) located at Burwood, Christchurch postcode 8061.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 500 shares) and includes
Fagerlund, Neville Petrie - located at Burwood, Christchurch. Npf Consulting Limited has been categorised as "Workplace training" (ANZSIC P810170).
Principal place of activity
16 Banks Avenue, Burwood, Christchurch, 8061 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 1, 567 Wairakei Road, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 29 Jun 2012 to 02 Mar 2016
Address #2: Unit 4, 567 Wairakei Road, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 May 2011 to 29 Jun 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 04 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Director | Fagerlund, Jill Mary Irene |
Burwood Christchurch 8061 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Fagerlund, Neville Petrie |
Burwood Christchurch 8061 New Zealand |
22 Nov 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Fagerlund, Neville |
Burwood Christchurch 8061 New Zealand |
06 May 2011 - 28 Jun 2011 |
Director | Neville Fagerlund |
Burwood Christchurch 8061 New Zealand |
06 May 2011 - 28 Jun 2011 |
Director | Llyween Janet Delves Couper |
North Canterbury 7402 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2011 - 22 Nov 2012 |
Individual | Couper, Llyween Janet Delves |
North Canterbury 7402 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2011 - 22 Nov 2012 |
Jill Mary Irene Fagerlund - Director
Appointment date: 16 Jun 2011
Address: Burwood, Christchurch, 8061 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Jun 2011
Neville Petrie Fagerlund - Director
Appointment date: 22 Nov 2012
Address: Burwood, Christchurch, 8061 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Nov 2012
Llyween Janet Delves Couper - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Jun 2011
Termination date: 22 Nov 2012
Address: North Canterbury, 7402 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Jun 2011
Neville Fagerlund - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 May 2011
Termination date: 22 Jun 2011
Address: Burwood, Christchurch, 8061 New Zealand
Address used since 06 May 2011
Orczy Holdings Limited
16 Banks Avenue
Kalmar Holdings Limited
16 Banks Avenue
Marian Foundation
126 North Parade
New Zealand Immigration Limited
36 Banks Avenue
Christchurch 168 Limited
36 Banks Avenue
Diamond Trio Limited
36 Banks Avenue
Emergency Department Medical Education Limited
8 Dee Street
Engine Coffee Brewers Limited
10 Haast Street
Gavcon Limited
43 Achilles Street
Premier Computing Limited
352 Manchester Street
Sps Biosecurity Limited
C/-duns Limited
Trainer Solutions Limited
98 Stapletons Road