Palermo Investments Limited was incorporated on 03 Nov 2010 and issued a business number of 9429031322928. This removed LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Samuel Harris Steel - an active director whose contract started on 03 Nov 2010,
Priscilla Sima Steel - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Jan 2012 and was terminated on 02 Apr 2013.
According to our information (updated on 21 Jun 2024), this company uses 1 address: 11 Beaconsfield St, Devonport, Auckland, 0624 (type: physical, registered).
Up to 24 Aug 2020, Palermo Investments Limited had been using 46 Church Street, Devonport, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 500 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Steel, Samuel Harris (a director) located at Devonport, Auckland postcode 0624.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 500 shares) and includes
Steel, Priscilla Sima - located at Devonport, Auckland. Palermo Investments Limited is classified as "Holding company operation - passive investment in subsidiary companies" (ANZSIC K624030).
Principal place of activity
11 Beaconsfield Street, Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 46 Church Street, Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Physical address used from 11 Apr 2013 to 24 Aug 2020
Address #2: 46 Church Street, Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Registered address used from 10 Apr 2013 to 24 Aug 2020
Address #3: 11 Brookfield Street, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Registered address used from 01 Mar 2012 to 10 Apr 2013
Address #4: 11 Brookfield Street, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Physical address used from 01 Mar 2012 to 11 Apr 2013
Address #5: 15 Bonnie Brae Road, Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 03 Nov 2010 to 01 Mar 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 06 Apr 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Director | Steel, Samuel Harris |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
03 Nov 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Steel, Priscilla Sima |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
03 Nov 2010 - |
Samuel Harris Steel - Director
Appointment date: 03 Nov 2010
Address: Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Nov 2019
Address: Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2012
Priscilla Sima Steel - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jan 2012
Termination date: 02 Apr 2013
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2012
Avalon Interiors Limited
44 Church Street
Keely Landscapes Limited
57 Church Street
Liquid Events Limited
45 Church Street
Total Entertainments Consultants Limited
45 Church Street
Kawau Island Action Incorporated
8/33 Vauxhall Road
Auckland Folk Festival Incorporated
21 Vauxhall Road
Black Rabbit Limited
Level 1, 49 Victoria Road
Brenchley Limited
16 Albert Road
Commercial Assets Limited
Level 1, 49 Victoria Road
Eton Trustee Limited
3/7 Eton Avenue
Fancourt Investment Holdings Limited
Level 1, 49 Victoria Road
Kardan Family Trust Limited
8/7 Owens Road