Rad Int Limited was incorporated on 30 Mar 2010 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031634083. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: John Charles Machin - an active director whose contract started on 30 Mar 2010,
Garry Michael Peek - an inactive director whose contract started on 30 Mar 2010 and was terminated on 28 Sep 2018.
According to our data (last updated on 14 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 11 Tarrant Way, Rd 20, Ohau, 5570 (type: registered, physical).
Until 21 Mar 2019, Rad Int Limited had been using 15 Aaron Court, Paraparaumu Beach, Paraparaumu as their registered address.
BizDb found other names for the company: from 30 Mar 2010 to 24 May 2018 they were called Radium International Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 3 groups (3 shareholders in total). In the first group, 480 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Machin, John Charles (an individual) located at Rd 20, Ohau postcode 5570.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 2 per cent shares (exactly 20 shares) and includes
Machin, John Charles - located at Paraparaumu Beach, Paraparaumu.
The 3rd share allocation (10 shares, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Machin, John Charles, located at Rd 20, Ohau (an individual). Rad Int Limited was categorised as "Management services nec" (business classification M696297).
Principal place of activity
11 Tarrant Way, Rd 20, Ohau, 5570 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 15 Aaron Court, Paraparaumu Beach, Paraparaumu, 5032 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 19 Jan 2015 to 21 Mar 2019
Address: 30 Quigley Street, Newlands, Wellington, 6037 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 Apr 2014 to 19 Jan 2015
Address: 25 Myrtle St, Woburn, Lower Hutt New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 30 Mar 2010 to 10 Apr 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 07 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 480 | |||
Individual | Machin, John Charles |
Rd 20 Ohau 5570 New Zealand |
30 Mar 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 20 | |||
Individual | Machin, John Charles |
Paraparaumu Beach Paraparaumu 5032 New Zealand |
30 Mar 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Machin, John Charles |
Rd 20 Ohau 5570 New Zealand |
30 Mar 2010 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Peek, Garry Michael |
Woburn Lower Hutt 5010 New Zealand |
30 Mar 2010 - 25 Sep 2018 |
Individual | Machin, Michelle Denese |
Paraparumu Beach Wellington New Zealand |
30 Mar 2010 - 09 Nov 2014 |
Individual | Peek, Jan Lynette |
Woburn Lower Hutt 5010 New Zealand |
30 Mar 2010 - 25 Sep 2018 |
Individual | Peek, Garry Michael |
Woburn Lower Hutt 5010 New Zealand |
30 Mar 2010 - 25 Sep 2018 |
Individual | Peek, Jan Lynette |
Woburn Lower Hutt 5010 New Zealand |
30 Mar 2010 - 25 Sep 2018 |
John Charles Machin - Director
Appointment date: 30 Mar 2010
Address: Rd 20, Ohau, 5570 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Mar 2019
Address: Paraparaumu Beach, Paraparaumu, 5032 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Apr 2015
Garry Michael Peek - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Mar 2010
Termination date: 28 Sep 2018
Address: Woburn, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jan 2017
Transport Futures Consulting Limited
3 Martin Road
Paraparaumu Cricket Club Incorporated
Kena Kena Park
G & A Merchants Limited
115 Golf Road
Honey Plus Limited
115 Golf Road
Peter Kendall Builders Limited
21 Bahama Crescent
Buzz Builders Limited
112 Golf Road
Homebuild Project Management Limited
67 Rata Road
Integrity Consulting Services Limited
15 Hurunui Street
Peake Performance (2005) Limited
93 Seaview Road
Shelbymax Limited
31 Flaxmere Street
Whitfield Factor Limited
210 Matai Road
Zaplutus Solutions Limited
63 Campbell Avenue