Obrien Anaesthesia Limited was registered on 17 Feb 2010 and issued a number of 9429031662246. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 1 director, named Nicole Cherie O'brien - an active director whose contract began on 17 Feb 2010.
As stated in BizDb's database (updated on 14 Aug 2024), the company filed 1 address: 52 Symonds Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 (category: physical, registered).
Up to 31 May 2017, Obrien Anaesthesia Limited had been using 22 Harcourt Street, Grey Lynn, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (4 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 99 shares are held by 3 entities, namely:
O'brien, Brien David (an individual) located at Rd2 Silverdale 0992,
O'brien, Nicole Cherie (an individual) located at Auckland postcode 1021,
Griffiths, David Stephen (an individual) located at Auckland 1010.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 1% shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
O'brien, Nicole Cherie - located at Auckland. Obrien Anaesthesia Limited has been classified as "Specialist medical practitioner nec" (ANZSIC Q851280).
Previous addresses
Address: 22 Harcourt Street, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 29 Nov 2011 to 31 May 2017
Address: 1f/ 31 Scanlan St, Grey Lynn 1021 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 17 Feb 2010 to 29 Nov 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 02 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Individual | O'brien, Brien David |
Rd2 Silverdale 0992 New Zealand |
17 Feb 2010 - |
Individual | O'brien, Nicole Cherie |
Auckland 1021 New Zealand |
17 Feb 2010 - |
Individual | Griffiths, David Stephen |
Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
17 Feb 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | O'brien, Nicole Cherie |
Auckland 1021 New Zealand |
17 Feb 2010 - |
Nicole Cherie O'brien - Director
Appointment date: 17 Feb 2010
Address: Grafton, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 29 May 2018
Address: Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Feb 2012
Kaival Investments Limited
Level 4
Secure Tech 2013 Limited
Level 4
Fleet Limited
Level 4, Hamburg Sud House
Simple Id Limited
Dfk Oswin Griffiths Carlton
Caltex Capricorn Limited
Level 4
Ranui Investments Limited
Level 4
Genitourinary Reconstructive Surgery Nz Limited
Level 6, 36 Kitchener Street
Ksw Consulting Limited
Level 6, 36 Kitchener Street
Practice 92 Limited
57 Symonds Street
Rajan Patel Limited
Level 6, 36 Kitchener Street
Sunshine Prn Limited
Level 1
T & P Chiu Limited
Level 6, 36 Kitchener Street