Ftw A&B Limited was registered on 09 Nov 2009 and issued a number of 9429031794015. This registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Bernard Tsz Lun Ip - an active director whose contract began on 09 Nov 2009,
Amos Tsz On Ip - an inactive director whose contract began on 09 Nov 2009 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2010.
According to BizDb's database (updated on 04 Aug 2024), the company filed 1 address: 5 Ardagh Place, Dannemora, Auckland, 2016 (type: physical, registered).
A total of 100 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Ip, Bernard Tsz Lun (an individual) located at Dannemora, Auckland.
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 31 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Ip, Bernard Tsz Lun |
Dannemora Auckland New Zealand |
09 Nov 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Ip, Amos Tsz On |
Howick Auckland New Zealand |
09 Nov 2009 - 26 Jul 2010 |
Bernard Tsz Lun Ip - Director
Appointment date: 09 Nov 2009
Address: Dannemora, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jul 2015
Amos Tsz On Ip - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Nov 2009
Termination date: 01 Apr 2010
Address: Howick, Auckland, New Zealand
Address used since 09 Nov 2009
Urban Siteworks Limited
3 Ardagh Place
Autoworld Enterprises Limited
4 Ardagh Place
Hanodi Holdings Limited
4 Ardagh Place
Ar & Rh Enterprises Limited
4 Ardagh Place
Save On Food Limited
78 Kilkenny Drive
P And I Superette Limited
78 Kilkenny Drive