Etay Limited, a registered company, was registered on 06 Oct 2009. 9429031854184 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Alvin Foon Pung Yam - an active director whose contract started on 06 Oct 2009,
Lee Fen Tan - an inactive director whose contract started on 06 Oct 2009 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2021.
Updated on 08 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 22 Drumconnell Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 (types include: physical, registered).
Etay Limited had been using 27 Charlestown Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland as their physical address up until 13 Apr 2021.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Yam, Alvin Foon Pung - located at 2019, Flat Bush, Auckland.
Principal place of activity
27 Charlestown Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 27 Charlestown Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Physical address used from 09 Nov 2015 to 13 Apr 2021
Address: 27 Charlestown Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Registered address used from 04 May 2015 to 13 Apr 2021
Address: 51 Broomfields Rd, Whitford, Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 06 Oct 2009 to 09 Nov 2015
Address: 51 Broomfields Rd, Whitford, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 06 Oct 2009 to 04 May 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 29 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Yam, Alvin Foon Pung |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 New Zealand |
06 Oct 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Tan, Lee Fen |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 New Zealand |
06 Oct 2009 - 05 Apr 2021 |
Alvin Foon Pung Yam - Director
Appointment date: 06 Oct 2009
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2021
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Oct 2015
Lee Fen Tan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Oct 2009
Termination date: 01 Apr 2021
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Oct 2015
Haikou Homes Limited
31 Charlestown Drive
Future Holding 2015 Limited
39 Charlestown Drive
Ccw Investment Limited
31 Charlestown Drive
Prabh Aasra Trust
29 Charlestown Drive
Radiant Nails And Beauty Limited
12 Ballindrait Drive
Atranz Limited
38 Charlestown Drive