Auckland Stonemasons Limited, a registered company, was launched on 20 Feb 1981. 9429032145472 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Bricklaying services" (business classification E322210) is how the company is classified. This company has been supervised by 3 directors: Leonard Andrew Lavas - an active director whose contract started on 21 Feb 1992,
James Michael Lavas - an active director whose contract started on 22 Nov 2001,
James Ivan Lavas - an inactive director whose contract started on 21 Feb 1992 and was terminated on 01 Dec 2023.
Last updated on 02 Sep 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: Sap Tower, 151 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (category: registered, service).
Auckland Stonemasons Limited had been using Fay Richwhite Building, 151 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland as their registered address until 03 Sep 2024.
Previous aliases for the company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 20 Feb 1981 to 30 Mar 2000 they were called Valentino Enterprises Limited.
A total of 15000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders (3 groups). The first group includes 5000 shares (33.33 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 5000 shares (33.33 per cent). Lastly the third share allocation (5000 shares 33.33 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Other active addresses
Address #4: 1 Sandstone Road, Rd 1, Whitford, 2576 New Zealand
Delivery address used from 15 Aug 2019
Address #5: Fay Richwhite Building, 151 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Shareregister address used from 26 Jul 2023
Address #6: Fay Richwhite Building, 151 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Office address used from 03 Aug 2023
Address #7: 29 Stoneridge Terrace, Whitford, 2576 New Zealand
Delivery address used from 03 Aug 2023
Address #8: Sap Tower, 151 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Shareregister address used from 26 Aug 2024
Address #9: Sap Tower, 151 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 03 Sep 2024
Principal place of activity
24-26 Pollen Street P.o., Box 47145, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Fay Richwhite Building, 151 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 03 Aug 2023 to 03 Sep 2024
Address #2: 24-26 Pollen Street P.o., Box 47145, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Service address used from 19 Aug 2016 to 03 Aug 2023
Address #3: 24-26 Pollen Street, Ponsonby, Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 05 Oct 2002 to 19 Aug 2016
Address #4: 24-26 Pollen Street, Ponsonby, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 05 Oct 2002 to 03 Aug 2023
Address #5: C/- Withers Tsang & Co Limited, 24-26 Pollen Street, Ponsonby, Auckland
Registered address used from 23 Sep 2002 to 05 Oct 2002
Address #6: Same As Registered Office Address
Physical address used from 23 Sep 2002 to 05 Oct 2002
Address #7: 311 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland
Physical address used from 15 May 2002 to 23 Sep 2002
Address #8: 311 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland
Registered address used from 23 Apr 2002 to 23 Sep 2002
Address #9: 124 Symonds Street, Auckland 1
Physical address used from 10 Sep 1998 to 10 Sep 1998
Address #10: 151 Dominion Road, Mt Eden, Auckland
Physical address used from 10 Sep 1998 to 15 May 2002
Address #11: 124 Symonds Street, Auckland 1
Registered address used from 10 Sep 1998 to 23 Apr 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 15000
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 08 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Individual | Lavas, James Michael |
Whitford |
20 Feb 1981 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Individual | Lavas, James Ivan |
Whitford |
20 Feb 1981 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Individual | Lavas, Len Andrew |
Whitford |
20 Feb 1981 - |
Leonard Andrew Lavas - Director
Appointment date: 21 Feb 1992
Address: Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Aug 2015
James Michael Lavas - Director
Appointment date: 22 Nov 2001
Address: Maraetai, Auckland, 2018 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2014
James Ivan Lavas - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Feb 1992
Termination date: 01 Dec 2023
Address: Whitford, Whitford, 2149 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Aug 2021
Address: Whitford, Auckland, 2576 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Aug 2015
Bob's Properties Limited
24-26 Pollen Street
Bloomfields Garden Centre Limited
24-26 Pollen Street
Ns Seven Holdings Limited
24-26 Pollen St
Find My Limited
24-26 Pollen Street
Aspiring Building Consultants Limited
24-26 Pollen Street
Duthie And Associates Limited
24-26 Pollen Street
A J Russell Bricklayers Limited
203 Queen Street
Holmes Bricklaying Limited
Grafton
London Brickies Limited
C/-lowthers Limited
Srg Global Refractory Services (nz) Limited
10 Viaduct Harbour Avenue
Storey Bricklayers Limited
2 Crummer Road
West Auckland Brick & Blocklayers (2006) Limited
18 Viaduct Harbour Avenue