Kotare Lane Limited, a registered company, was launched on 08 Jul 2009. 9429032168617 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Graham Francis Burt - an active director whose contract started on 08 Jul 2009,
Irene Claudette Burt - an active director whose contract started on 08 Jul 2009.
Last updated on 21 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 7 Gladstone Road South, Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024 (types include: physical, service).
Kotare Lane Limited had been using 149 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch as their physical address until 26 May 2021.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders (3 groups). The first group is comprised of 1 share (1%) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which includes 2 shareholders in control of 98 shares (98%). Lastly the next share allotment (1 share 1%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 149 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Physical address used from 05 Jun 2018 to 26 May 2021
Address #2: 149 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Registered address used from 05 Jun 2018 to 26 Jul 2019
Address #3: 156 Vagues Road, Northcote, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 05 Jun 2014 to 05 Jun 2018
Address #4: 16 Farnswood Place, Redwood, Christchurch, 8051 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 08 Jun 2012 to 05 Jun 2014
Address #5: Snell Consultants Limited, Level 3, 64 Cashel Street, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 08 Jul 2009 to 08 Jun 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 13 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Burt, Graham Francis |
Company Bay Dunedin 9014 New Zealand |
08 Jul 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 98 | |||
Individual | Burt, Graham Francis |
Company Bay Dunedin 9014 New Zealand |
08 Jul 2009 - |
Individual | Burt, Irene Claudette |
Company Bay Dunedin 9014 New Zealand |
08 Jul 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Burt, Irene Claudette |
Company Bay Dunedin 9014 New Zealand |
08 Jul 2009 - |
Graham Francis Burt - Director
Appointment date: 08 Jul 2009
Address: Company Bay, Dunedin, 9014 New Zealand
Address used since 18 May 2021
Address: Rd 2, Waikouaiti, 9471 New Zealand
Address used since 31 May 2016
Irene Claudette Burt - Director
Appointment date: 08 Jul 2009
Address: Company Bay, Dunedin, 9014 New Zealand
Address used since 18 May 2021
Address: Rd 2, Waikouaiti, 9471 New Zealand
Address used since 31 May 2016
Covenant Bride Ministries
C/-judy Greer
Voltron Electrical Limited
8a Cavendish Road
Tony Mclean Electrical Limited
8a Cavendish Road
Gray Brothers Demolition Limited
61 Northcote Road
Metro Builders Limited
4 Phoenix Lane
Hitfit Christchurch Limited
113 Vagues Road