Me and City International Limited, a registered company, was started on 22 Jun 2009. 9429032213577 is the business number it was issued. "Wholesale trade nec" (business classification F373970) is how the company was classified. This company has been run by 1 director, named Chao Yu - an active director whose contract started on 22 Jun 2009.
Last updated on 22 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 68A Howe Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 (category: registered, physical).
Me and City International Limited had been using 28 Studfall Street, Pakuranga Heights, Auckland as their registered address up to 15 Nov 2016.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Yu, Chao - located at 2014, Howick, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 28 Studfall Street, Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 29 Jul 2011 to 15 Nov 2016
Address #2: Shop 11 & 12, The Mall, St Heliers, Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 22 Jun 2009 to 29 Jul 2011
Address #3: 62 Burswood Drive, Burswood,manukau,auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 22 Jun 2009 to 29 Jul 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 03 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Yu, Chao |
Howick Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
22 Jun 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Su, Qi |
Burswood Manukau,auckland New Zealand |
22 Jun 2009 - 20 Jul 2011 |
Chao Yu - Director
Appointment date: 22 Jun 2009
Address: Howick, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Nov 2016
Cy & Yx Home Limited
68a Howe Street
Triple Seven Limited
2/53 Wellington Street
Ridrey Produce Limited
62a Howe Street
White Creative Limited
59a Wellington Street
Eskaper Limited
60 Howe Street
Sandra Taylor Investments Limited
69 Howe Street
Bzyki Limited
16 Vincent Street
Integrity International Limited
32a Bleakhouse Road
Juridcl International Sports Limited
122 Union Road
Silver (nz) Limited
69 Ridge Road
Transnet Nz Limited
James Gavin Donovan
Z Products Limited
1/68 Haseler Crescent