Buckthought Engineering Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 09 Oct 2008. 9429032535235 is the NZBN it was issued. This company has been run by 2 directors: Wayne Brian Buckthought - an active director whose contract started on 09 Oct 2008,
Kim Anne Buckthought - an active director whose contract started on 09 Oct 2008.
Updated on 11 Sep 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 141 Powderham Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 (types include: registered, service).
Buckthought Engineering Limited had been using 25 Dawson Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth as their registered address up to 07 Aug 2023.
A total of 2000 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders (3 groups). The first group is comprised of 1998 shares (99.9%) held by 3 entities. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (0.05%). Finally there is the third share allotment (1 share 0.05%) made up of 1 entity.
Other active addresses
Address #4: 141 Powderham Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 22 May 2024
Previous addresses
Address #1: 25 Dawson Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 21 Apr 2023 to 07 Aug 2023
Address #2: C/- Laurie Jordan Fca Limited, Corner Broadway & Regan Streets, Stratford, 4332 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 27 Aug 2010 to 01 Aug 2012
Address #3: C/-jordan Horton & Co Ltd, 199 Broadway, Stratford New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 09 Oct 2008 to 27 Aug 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 2000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 29 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1998 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Buckthought Family Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051123123 |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
13 Apr 2023 - |
Individual | Buckthought, Kim Anne |
Rd 6 Inglewood 4386 New Zealand |
09 Oct 2008 - |
Individual | Buckthought, Wayne Brian |
Rd 6 Inglewood 4386 New Zealand |
09 Oct 2008 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Buckthought, Kim Anne |
Rd 6 Inglewood 4386 New Zealand |
09 Oct 2008 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Buckthought, Wayne Brian |
Rd 6 Inglewood 4386 New Zealand |
09 Oct 2008 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Jordan, Laurence Edward |
Bell Block New Plymouth 4312 New Zealand |
09 Oct 2008 - 13 Apr 2023 |
Wayne Brian Buckthought - Director
Appointment date: 09 Oct 2008
Address: Rd 6, Inglewood, 4386 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jun 2016
Kim Anne Buckthought - Director
Appointment date: 09 Oct 2008
Address: Rd 6, Inglewood, 4386 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jun 2016
Mountain View Stables Limited
Cnr Broadway And Regan Street
Oswald Properties Limited
Corner Broadway & Regan Streets
Mander Properties Limited
Cnr Broadway And Regan Street
Jackson Stratford Trustees Limited
Cnr Broadway & Regan Street
Eshcol Limited
Cnr Broadway & Regan Street
Stairco Limited
Corner Broadway & Regan Street