Credac Limited was registered on 02 May 2008 and issued a number of 9429032762556. The registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: Stewart H. - an active director whose contract started on 03 Feb 2009,
Timothy James Shaw - an active director whose contract started on 03 Feb 2009,
Carolyn Ward Melville - an inactive director whose contract started on 02 May 2008 and was terminated on 03 Feb 2009.
As stated in BizDb's database (last updated on 25 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: 7 Windsor Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (category: physical, service).
Up until 07 Oct 2015, Credac Limited had been using 382 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Cta&C Limited (an entity) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052. Credac Limited has been classified as "Portfolio investment management service" (business classification K641940).
Previous addresses
Address: 382 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Physical address used from 06 Mar 2015 to 07 Oct 2015
Address: 382 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Registered address used from 12 Feb 2014 to 07 Oct 2015
Address: 382 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Registered address used from 28 Nov 2012 to 12 Feb 2014
Address: 382 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Physical address used from 28 Nov 2012 to 06 Mar 2015
Address: Level 5, 10 Customhouse Quay, Wellington, 6143 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 18 Nov 2011 to 28 Nov 2012
Address: 412 Lake Road, Takapuna, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 02 May 2008 to 18 Nov 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 25 Feb 2019
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Cta&c Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030428553 |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
19 Nov 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Teil Nominees (ocs) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030865297 Company Number: 3675195 |
12 Mar 2012 - 19 Nov 2013 | |
Entity | Pakiri Securities Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033168142 Company Number: 1979733 |
02 May 2008 - 12 Mar 2012 | |
Entity | Teil Nominees (ocs) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030865297 Company Number: 3675195 |
12 Mar 2012 - 19 Nov 2013 | |
Entity | Pakiri Securities Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033168142 Company Number: 1979733 |
02 May 2008 - 12 Mar 2012 |
Stewart H. - Director
Appointment date: 03 Feb 2009
Timothy James Shaw - Director
Appointment date: 03 Feb 2009
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2016
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Feb 2009
Carolyn Ward Melville - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 May 2008
Termination date: 03 Feb 2009
Address: Takapuna, Auckland,
Address used since 02 May 2008
Vaniye Limited
1/7 Windsor Street
Green Inc Limited
7 Windsor Street
Levi Strauss New Zealand Limited
Suite 3, 7 Windsor St
Cartoncloud Pty Ltd
7 Windsor Street
Anna Hinehou Limited
Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace
Ph10 Limited
144 Parnell Road
Citic Capital Holdings Limited
57 Mahuhu Crescent
Cmeek Trustees Limited
4 Augustus Terrace
Foundry Asset Management Limited
100 Parnell Road
Insurance Supermarket Limited
Level 9, 2 Emily Place
Kirthi Trustee Limited
1d/11 Augustus Terrace
Pohutukawa Finance Limited
Level 2, 112parnell Road