Harmony By Design Limited, a registered company, was launched on 06 Dec 2007. 9429033001678 is the business number it was issued. "Interior design or decorating consultancy service" (ANZSIC M692460) is how the company has been classified. This company has been run by 3 directors: Heather Jayne Beehre - an active director whose contract began on 01 Apr 2019,
Kenneth Henry Barthow - an inactive director whose contract began on 06 Dec 2007 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2019,
Phillip John Buckley - an inactive director whose contract began on 06 Dec 2007 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2019.
Updated on 17 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 3 addresses the company registered, namely: Unit 14, 17 Ben Lomond Crescent, Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010 (registered address),
Unit 14, 17 Ben Lomond Crescent, Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010 (service address),
Level 12. 17 Albert Street, Auckland, 1010 (physical address),
Level 12. 17 Albert Street, Auckland, 1010 (registered address) among others.
Harmony By Design Limited had been using Level 12. 17 Albert Street, Auckland as their registered address until 16 Nov 2017.
Other names for the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 06 Dec 2007 to 29 Apr 2019 they were named Kaptec Holdings Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 9 shareholders (6 groups). The first group is comprised of 1 share (0.1 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 3 shareholders in control of 498 shares (49.8 per cent). Finally the 3rd share allotment (1 share 0.1 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 12. 17 Albert Street, Auckland, 1141 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 19 Nov 2014 to 16 Nov 2017
Address #2: Business Development Specialists, Level 12. 17 Albert Street, Auckland, 1141 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 14 Nov 2013 to 19 Nov 2014
Address #3: 22 Glenmore Road, Pakuranga, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Dec 2007 to 14 Nov 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 18 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Buckley, Phillip John |
Pakuranga Heights Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
06 Dec 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 498 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Aviemore Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035562726 |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
06 Mar 2008 - |
Individual | Buckley, Phillip John |
Pakuranga Heights Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
06 Dec 2007 - |
Individual | Beehre, Heather Jayne |
Pakuranga Heights Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
06 Dec 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Beehre, Heather Jayne |
Pakuranga Heights Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
06 Dec 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Barthow, Kenneth Henry |
Wattle Downs Auckland 2103 New Zealand |
06 Dec 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 498 | |||
Individual | Barthow, Angela Maria |
Wattle Downs Auckland 2103 New Zealand |
06 Dec 2007 - |
Individual | Barthow, Kenneth Henry |
Wattle Downs Auckland 2103 New Zealand |
06 Dec 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #6 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Barthow, Angela Maria |
Wattle Downs Auckland 2103 New Zealand |
06 Dec 2007 - |
Heather Jayne Beehre - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2019
Address: Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2019
Address: Northpark, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2019
Kenneth Henry Barthow - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Dec 2007
Termination date: 01 Apr 2019
Address: Wattle Downs, Auckland, 2103 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Nov 2016
Phillip John Buckley - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Dec 2007
Termination date: 01 Apr 2019
Address: Sunnyhills, Manukau, 2010 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Oct 2009
Address: Northpark, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Apr 2019
S.c. Johnson & Son Proprietary Limited
Level 8, 79 Queen St
Nicholls & Maher (nz) Limited
Level 4, Bdo Centre, 4 Graham Street
D M Dunningham Limited
Level 29, 188 Quay Street
Mj Wyborn Ventures Limited
Level 5, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue
Corvus Oteha Valley Joint Venture Limited
Level 4, 52 Symonds Street
Corvus New Zealand Limited
Level 4, 52 Symonds Street
Bureaux Limited
13th Floor, 92 Albert Street
Gaze Commercial Limited
Level 5
La Belle Maison Design Limited
13th Floor, 92 Albert Street
Sosimple Limited
Level 3, 60 Cook Street
Todd Space Limited
203 Queen Street
Yellow 6 Design Limited
44 Wellesley Street