Mistol Investments Limited, a registered company, was started on 26 Jun 2007. 9429033357973 is the number it was issued. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Stuart Rose - an active director whose contract began on 26 Jun 2007,
Michelle Rose - an inactive director whose contract began on 26 Jun 2007 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2021.
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 23 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Rose, Stuart |
Christchurch |
26 Jun 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Rose, Michelle |
Christchurch |
26 Jun 2007 - 12 May 2021 |
Stuart Rose - Director
Appointment date: 26 Jun 2007
Address: Christchurch, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Apr 2016
Michelle Rose - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Jun 2007
Termination date: 31 Mar 2021
Address: Christchurch, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Mar 2016
Galrose Holdings Limited
65 Rossall Street
Granite Black Limited
11 Highgate Avenue
Children Of Solu Khumbu Nepal
10 Highgate Avenue
Acutecrew Limited
10a Highgate Avenue
Cyclotec Limited
10a Highgate Avenue
Andara Holdings Limited
57a Rossall Street