Mind Strong Limited was started on 09 Mar 2007 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429033573564. This registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Haydon Julian Mace - an active director whose contract began on 09 Mar 2007,
Sarah Louise Mace - an inactive director whose contract began on 09 Mar 2007 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2017.
According to the BizDb data (updated on 19 Aug 2024), this company uses 2 addresses: 89 Lonely Track Road, Fairview Heights, Auckland, 0632 (registered address),
89 Lonely Track Road, Fairview Heights, Auckland, 0632 (service address),
8 Bentley Avenue, Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 (physical address).
Until 05 Jun 2024, Mind Strong Limited had been using 8 Bentley Avenue, Glenfield, Auckland as their registered address.
BizDb identified previous aliases used by this company: from 09 Mar 2007 to 28 Apr 2017 they were called Action Plumbing Nz Limited.
A total of 10000 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 10000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Mace, Haydon Julian (an individual) located at Fairview Heights, Auckland postcode 0632. Mind Strong Limited is categorised as "Life coach" (business classification S953942).
Principal place of activity
8 Bentley Avenue, Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 8 Bentley Avenue, Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 02 Jul 2015 to 05 Jun 2024
Address #2: 345b Wairau Road, Totara Vale, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Jun 2013 to 02 Jul 2015
Address #3: 40 Willoughby Street, Paeroa New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 09 Mar 2007 to 06 Jun 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 27 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 10000 | |||
Individual | Mace, Haydon Julian |
Fairview Heights Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
09 Mar 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mace, Sarah Louise |
Glenfield Auckland 0629 New Zealand |
09 Mar 2007 - 27 Apr 2017 |
Haydon Julian Mace - Director
Appointment date: 09 Mar 2007
Address: Fairview Heights, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 27 May 2024
Address: Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Jun 2015
Sarah Louise Mace - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Mar 2007
Termination date: 31 Mar 2017
Address: Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Jun 2015
Ss Tiling Limited
10 Bentley Avenue
Value Data Limited
Flat 1, 3 Bentley Avenue
Elby Innovation Limited
12 Bentley Avenue
Lynken Holdings Limited
Flat 1, 1 Battle Place
Konz Food Limited
Flat 2, 5 Battle Place
Kunwar Dev Consultancy Limited
1/63 Chartwell Avenue
Cre8ive Soul-utions (2016) Limited
106 Seaview Road
Focus Point Limited
112 Manuka Rd
Kirrilee Konsulting Limited
2/16a Manuka Road
Primal Rituals Limited
20 Bryers Place
The Kids Coach Limited
20 Bryers Place
Weigh In Limited
25 Chequers Avenue