Artyfacts Limited, a registered company, was registered on 01 Mar 2007. 9429033583518 is the NZBN it was issued. "Book and other publishing (except internet)" (business classification J541310) is how the company was classified. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Sylvia Joan Dixon - an active director whose contract began on 01 Mar 2007,
Christopher David Brodrick - an active director whose contract began on 01 Mar 2007.
Last updated on 26 Jul 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 2 addresses the company uses, namely: Level 1, 136 Ilam Road, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 (registered address),
Level 1, 136 Ilam Road, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 (physical address),
Level 1, 136 Ilam Road, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 (service address),
Po Box 833, Christchurch Mail Centre, Christchurch, 8140 (postal address) among others.
Artyfacts Limited had been using 5 Newnham Terrace, Upper Riccarton, Christchurch as their registered address up until 17 Feb 2020.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 50 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50 per cent).
Principal place of activity
21 Totara Street, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 5 Newnham Terrace, Upper Riccarton, Christchurch, 8542 New Zealand
Registered address used from 10 Nov 2015 to 17 Feb 2020
Address #2: 75 Williams Street, Kaiapoi, North Canterbury New Zealand
Registered address used from 22 Oct 2009 to 10 Nov 2015
Address #3: 21 Totara Street, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical address used from 01 Mar 2007 to 17 Feb 2020
Address #4: Flintoft & Associates, 124 Williams Street, Kaiapoi
Registered address used from 01 Mar 2007 to 22 Oct 2009
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 01 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Dixon, Sylvia Joan |
Christchurch |
01 Mar 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Brodrick, Christopher David |
Christchurch |
01 Mar 2007 - |
Sylvia Joan Dixon - Director
Appointment date: 01 Mar 2007
Address: Fendalton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Oct 2009
Christopher David Brodrick - Director
Appointment date: 01 Mar 2007
Address: Fendalton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Oct 2009
Earl Investments Limited
5 Newnham Terrace
Wigram Skies Vet Property Limited
5 Newnham Terrace
Mt Michael Lodge Limited Partnership
Ager, Riley & Cocks Chartered Accountant
Stewart Island Smoked Salmon Limited
322 Riccarton Road
Round 12 Tuam Street Limited
322 Riccarton Road
Book Renter Limited
39 Straven Road
Indica Et Buddhica Distributors Limited
23 Straven Road
Indica Et Buddhica Publishers Limited
23 Straven Road
Navpress Nz Limited
47b Arthur Street
Plot Press Limited
Unit 1b
Spriggit Publications Limited
253 Ilam Road