Quill Creations Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 11 Jan 2007. 9429033660653 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been run by 3 directors: Ivan James Mcquillan - an active director whose contract started on 11 Jan 2007,
Sandra Jewel Mcquillan - an inactive director whose contract started on 11 Jan 2007 and was terminated on 16 May 2017,
David Gordon Lowbridge Bennett - an inactive director whose contract started on 11 Jan 2007 and was terminated on 10 Sep 2008.
Updated on 22 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 451A Albert Street, Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410 (category: physical, registered).
Quill Creations Limited had been using 7 Summerhays Street, Terrace End, Palmerston North as their registered address up to 24 May 2017.
Other names for the company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 11 Jan 2007 to 11 Sep 2008 they were called Bencu Shelf No. 36 Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 600 shares (60 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 400 shares (40 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: 7 Summerhays Street, Terrace End, Palmerston North, 4410 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Mar 2015 to 24 May 2017
Address: Bennett Curie Limited, 484 Main Street, Palmerston North New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Jan 2007 to 06 Mar 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 30 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 600 | |||
Individual | Mcquillan, Ivan James |
Hokowhitu Palmerston North 4410 New Zealand |
10 Sep 2008 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 400 | |||
Individual | Mcquillan, Sandra Jewel |
Hokowhitu Palmerston North 4410 New Zealand |
10 Sep 2008 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Bennett, David Gordon Lowbridge |
Palmerston North |
11 Jan 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Ivan James Mcquillan - Director
Appointment date: 11 Jan 2007
Address: Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410 New Zealand
Address used since 16 May 2017
Sandra Jewel Mcquillan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Jan 2007
Termination date: 16 May 2017
Address: Palmerston North, 4410 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Jul 2016
David Gordon Lowbridge Bennett - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Jan 2007
Termination date: 10 Sep 2008
Address: Palmerston North,
Address used since 11 Jan 2007
Ivan Mcquillan Limited
451a Albert Street
Findlay Construction Limited
451 Albert Street
The Blue Pear Company Limited
431 Albert Street
Empower Foundation
19 Stirling Crescent
The Surgery Clinic Limited
7 Centennial Drive
315 Properties Limited
30 Centennial Drive