Forestate Nz Management Limited was launched on 06 Nov 2006 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429033784953. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 6 directors: Daniel William Madlung - an active director whose contract started on 06 Nov 2006,
Colin Michael Eves - an active director whose contract started on 06 Nov 2006,
Dan Madlung - an active director whose contract started on 06 Nov 2006,
Colin Eves - an active director whose contract started on 06 Nov 2006,
Kimbal Stephen Von Lanthen - an active director whose contract started on 02 May 2022.
According to BizDb's data (updated on 18 Sep 2024), this company filed 1 address: 396 Childers Road Gisborne 4010, Gisborne, 4010 (category: physical, service).
Until 12 Dec 2011, Forestate Nz Management Limited had been using Wood Walton Chartered Accountants Ltd, 55 Eighth Avenue, Tauranga as their registered address.
A total of 11000000 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 5500000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Madlung, Daniel William (an individual) located at Canmore/Alberta postcode T1W 3C3.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 5500000 shares) and includes
Eves, Colin Michael - located at Comox/Bc. Forestate Nz Management Limited is classified as "Forestry ownership or management (excluding field operations)" (ANZSIC M696235).
Previous address
Address: Wood Walton Chartered Accountants Ltd, 55 Eighth Avenue, Tauranga New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Nov 2006 to 12 Dec 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 11000000
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 08 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 5500000 | |||
Individual | Madlung, Daniel William |
Canmore/alberta T1W 3C3 Canada |
17 May 2022 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5500000 | |||
Individual | Eves, Colin Michael |
Comox/bc V9M 3N4 Canada |
17 May 2022 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Madlung, Dan |
Canmore Alberta, Canada T1w 3c3 |
06 Nov 2006 - 17 May 2022 |
Individual | Eves, Colin |
Comox, Bc V9M 3N4 Canada |
06 Nov 2006 - 17 May 2022 |
Daniel William Madlung - Director
Appointment date: 06 Nov 2006
Address: Canmore, Alberta, T1W 3C3 Canada
Address used since 01 Nov 2010
Colin Michael Eves - Director
Appointment date: 06 Nov 2006
Address: Comox Bc, V9M 3N4 Canada
Address used since 10 Nov 2014
Dan Madlung - Director
Appointment date: 06 Nov 2006
Address: Canmore, Alberta, T1W 3C3 Canada
Address used since 01 Nov 2010
Colin Eves - Director
Appointment date: 06 Nov 2006
Address: Comox Bc, V9M 3N4 Canada
Address used since 10 Nov 2014
Kimbal Stephen Von Lanthen - Director
Appointment date: 02 May 2022
Address: Strathmore Park, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Address used since 02 May 2022
Sarah Emily Jack - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Aug 2015
Termination date: 06 May 2022
ASIC Name: Muddy River Agricultural Pty Ltd
Address: Echuca, Victoria, 3564 Australia
Address: St. Kilda East, Melbourne, Victoria, 3183 Australia
Address used since 15 Aug 2015
Address: Echuca, Victoria, 3564 Australia
Ynot Repairs Limited
397 Childers Road
Columbine Hosiery Limited
166 Disraeli St
Columbine Industries Limited
166 Disraeli St
Moffat Investments Limited
166 Disraeli St
The Gisborne Tennis Club Incorporated
Gisborne Tennis Club Inc
Auto Care Valet Limited
387 Childers Road
Donbar Forestry Limited
Awakeri
Glenlea Lumber Company Limited
96 Waioweka Road
Jura Forest Limited
93 Walkers Road
Lisbon Forestry Investments Limited
302 Riverina Road
Palm Trees Limited
96 Waioweka Road
Rk Forestry Limited
304 Whakaagiangi Road