Hydrotrader Limited was started on 18 Oct 2006 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429033813813. The registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: Warwick Pascoe - an active director whose contract began on 18 Oct 2006,
Gus Walkden - an inactive director whose contract began on 18 Oct 2006 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2024,
Anthony Davoren - an inactive director whose contract began on 18 Oct 2006 and was terminated on 12 Jun 2023.
As stated in our data (last updated on 18 Sep 2024), the company registered 1 address: 11 Emlyn Place, Torbay, Auckland, 0630 (type: registered, service).
Until 14 Mar 2017, Hydrotrader Limited had been using 317 Blenheim Road, Christchurch as their registered address.
A total of 150 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 150 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Pascoe, Warwick (an individual) located at Torbay, Auckland postcode 0630. Hydrotrader Limited has been categorised as "Commission selling service" (business classification G432010).
Previous address
Address #1: 317 Blenheim Road, Christchurch New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 18 Oct 2006 to 14 Mar 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 150
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 13 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 150 | |||
Individual | Pascoe, Warwick |
Torbay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
18 Oct 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Davoren, Raewyn Anne |
Cashmere Christchurch 8022 New Zealand |
27 Nov 2023 - 25 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Walkden, Gus |
Aidanfield Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
18 Oct 2006 - 25 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Davoren, Anthony |
Cashmere Christchurch 8022 New Zealand |
18 Oct 2006 - 27 Nov 2023 |
Warwick Pascoe - Director
Appointment date: 18 Oct 2006
Address: Torbay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Oct 2021
Address: Torbay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Mar 2019
Address: Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Mar 2013
Gus Walkden - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Oct 2006
Termination date: 31 Mar 2024
Address: Aidanfield, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Mar 2014
Anthony Davoren - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Oct 2006
Termination date: 12 Jun 2023
Address: Christchurch, Christchurch, 8022 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Mar 2016
Surestyles Limited
9 Benedict Street
Surestyles Investments Limited
9 Benedict Street
Legend Property Investment Limited
8 Fintan Mews
Ldm Home Consultant Limited
8 Fintan Mews
Craf Holdings Limited
3 Fintan Mews
R A & C R Davies Limited
3 Fintan Mews
Buena Ware Limited
1/40 Hayton Road
Connexion Nz International Group Limited
4 Rowanwood Close
I-raise Investment Limited
7 Piper Street
Nz Ventilation Limited
C/- Westpac Hub,55 Jack Hinton Drive
Peng Yuan Holdings Limited
166 Riccarton Road
Smart Play Limited
4 Glovers Road