Hypermac Chassis Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 19 Jul 2006. 9429034017739 is the business number it was issued. "General engineering" (business classification C249910) is how the company was classified. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Shane Bruce Mcintyre - an active director whose contract started on 19 Jul 2006,
Suzanne Louise Gladding - an inactive director whose contract started on 19 Jul 2006 and was terminated on 23 Feb 2012.
Last updated on 29 Jul 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 263 State Highway 63, Renwick, 7271 (type: physical, service).
Hypermac Chassis Limited had been using 10 Cairnmuir Crescent, Cromwell, Cromwell as their registered address until 25 Jun 2019.
Old names used by this company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 19 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2011 they were named 0800 Woodfloors Limited.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 10000 shares) - Mcintyre, Shane Bruce - located at 7271, Renwick.
Principal place of activity
263 State Highway 63, Renwick, 7271 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 10 Cairnmuir Crescent, Cromwell, Cromwell, 9310 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 07 Jun 2017 to 25 Jun 2019
Address #2: 65 Centennial Avenue, Alexandra, Alexandra, 9320 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 09 May 2014 to 07 Jun 2017
Address #3: 2 Andalusian Place, Papamoa Beach, 3118 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 03 Jan 2013 to 09 May 2014
Address #4: 50 Jensen Road, Tauranga New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 15 Jan 2007 to 03 Jan 2013
Address #5: 18 Belk Road South, Pyes Pa, Tauranga
Physical & registered address used from 19 Jul 2006 to 15 Jan 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 31 Jan 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 10000 | |||
Individual | Mcintyre, Shane Bruce |
Renwick 7271 New Zealand |
19 Jul 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Gladding, Suzanne Louise |
Tauranga New Zealand |
19 Jul 2006 - 17 Dec 2012 |
Shane Bruce Mcintyre - Director
Appointment date: 19 Jul 2006
Address: Cromwell, Cromwell, 9310 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Dec 2015
Address: Renwick, 7271 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jun 2019
Suzanne Louise Gladding - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Jul 2006
Termination date: 23 Feb 2012
Address: Rd 1, Tauranga, 3171 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Apr 2010
Ac Electrical 2003 Limited
21 Jollys Road
Deilf Limited
41 Gilling Place
Murdoch Enterprises (2017) Limited
57 Antimony Crescent
Indafrica Travel Marketing Limited
1 Cobb Court
Central Irrigation Services Limited
11 Pioneer Court
Colourscape Limited
12 Mansor Court
Central Metal Supplies Limited
29 The Mall
Desert Guns Limited
283 Bannockburn Road
Gare Heavy Diesel Limited
53 Ray Street
Hillside Fabrication Limited
10b Kerry Court
Ja Harrex Mechanical Limited
29 The Mall
Maintenance Engineering Queenstown
37 Antimony Crescent