Liangs Travel Service Limited, a registered company, was registered on 22 May 2006. 9429034115152 is the number it was issued. The company has been managed by 3 directors: Liang Ni - an active director whose contract began on 31 Oct 2012,
Xueqian Liang - an inactive director whose contract began on 22 May 2006 and was terminated on 09 Dec 2019,
Yumei Yu - an inactive director whose contract began on 22 May 2006 and was terminated on 01 Nov 2012.
Updated on 31 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 5 addresses this company uses, namely: 6 Longland St, Lake Hayes Estate, Queenstown, 9304 (registered address),
6 Longland St, Lake Hayes Estate, Queenstown, 9304 (service address),
6 Longland St, Lake Hayes Estate, Queenstown, 9304 (shareregister address),
6 Longland St, Lake Hayes Estate, Queenstown, 9304 (postal address) among others.
Liangs Travel Service Limited had been using Level 1, 462 Victoria Street, Hamilton, Waikato as their physical address up to 04 Dec 2019.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 80 shares (80%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 20 shares (20%).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 6 Longland St, Lake Hayes Estate, Queenstown, 9304 New Zealand
Postal & office & delivery & shareregister address used from 09 Nov 2023
Address #5: 6 Longland St, Lake Hayes Estate, Queenstown, 9304 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 17 Nov 2023
Principal place of activity
7 Mcinnes Place, Queenwood, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 1, 462 Victoria Street, Hamilton, Waikato, 3204 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 13 Nov 2017 to 04 Dec 2019
Address #2: Level 1, 462 Victoria Street, Hamilton, Waikato, 3240 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Nov 2011 to 13 Nov 2017
Address #3: 462 Victoria Street, Hamilton New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 22 May 2006 to 11 Nov 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 08 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 80 | |||
Director | Ni, Liang |
Queenwood Hamilton 3210 New Zealand |
31 Jan 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 20 | |||
Director | Ni, Liang |
Queenwood Hamilton 3210 New Zealand |
31 Jan 2018 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Liang, Xueqian |
Shelly Park Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
22 May 2006 - 31 Jan 2018 |
Individual | Yu, Yumei |
Shelly Park Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
22 May 2006 - 31 Jan 2018 |
Liang Ni - Director
Appointment date: 31 Oct 2012
Address: Queenwood, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Nov 2015
Xueqian Liang - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 May 2006
Termination date: 09 Dec 2019
Address: Shelly Park, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Nov 2017
Address: Huntington, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Nov 2010
Yumei Yu - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 May 2006
Termination date: 01 Nov 2012
Address: Huntington, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Nov 2010
Gurnell Harrison Trustee Company Limited
Level 1, 20 Rostrevor Street
Jcrb (fredericks) Limited
Level One, 53 King Street
Gurnell Harrison Law Limited
Level 1, 20 Rostrevor Street
Wilmac Property Limited
Level 1, 851 Victoria Street
Cake Box Limited
Level One, 53 King Street
Jcrb (cake Box) Limited
Level One, 53 King Street