Lufdon Plumbing Services Limited, a registered company, was started on 09 May 2006. 9429034130926 is the NZBN it was issued. The company has been supervised by 1 director, named Lucas Findon - an active director whose contract began on 09 May 2006.
Updated on 28 Jul 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 2 addresses this company registered, namely: 123 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke, Te Puke, 3119 (registered address),
123 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke, Te Puke, 3119 (physical address),
123 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke, Te Puke, 3119 (service address),
11 Marina Road, Torbay, North Shore City, 0630 (other address) among others.
Lufdon Plumbing Services Limited had been using 1181 Cameron Road, Gate Pa, Tauranga as their physical address until 12 Jul 2022.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 4 shareholders (3 groups). The first group includes 98 shares (98 per cent) held by 2 entities. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (1 per cent). Finally we have the 3rd share allocation (1 share 1 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 1181 Cameron Road, Gate Pa, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 27 Sep 2019 to 12 Jul 2022
Address #2: Suite G1, 27 Gillies Avenue, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 06 Oct 2017 to 27 Sep 2019
Address #3: Level1, 1 Gibraltar Crescent, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered address used from 23 Sep 2016 to 06 Oct 2017
Address #4: Level 1, 1 Gibraltar Crescent, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Physical address used from 07 Oct 2015 to 06 Oct 2017
Address #5: 1 Gibraltar Crescent, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Physical address used from 05 Jun 2015 to 07 Oct 2015
Address #6: 1 Gibraltar Crescent, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered address used from 05 Jun 2015 to 23 Sep 2016
Address #7: 12a St Albans Street, Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 29 Feb 2012 to 05 Jun 2015
Address #8: 7 Willowview Drive, Redwood, Christchurch, 8051 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 26 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
Address #9: 11 Marina Road, Torbay, North Shore City, 0630 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 25 May 2011 to 26 Jul 2011
Address #10: 30 Rutherford Terrace, Meadowbank, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 19 May 2009 to 25 May 2011
Address #11: 4/6 Lush Avenue, St Johns, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 13 Jul 2007 to 19 May 2009
Address #12: 6 Meadow Street, Otahuhu, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 09 May 2006 to 13 Jul 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 11 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 98 | |||
Individual | Findon, Shannon Leigh |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
02 Sep 2021 - |
Individual | Findon, Lucas |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
09 May 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Findon, Shannon Leigh |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
02 Sep 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Findon, Lucas |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
09 May 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Km Law Trustee (2016) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042445456 Company Number: 6043351 |
Tauranga South Tauranga 3112 New Zealand |
14 Aug 2017 - 29 Nov 2021 |
Entity | Km Law Trustee (2016) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042445456 Company Number: 6043351 |
Tauranga South Tauranga 3112 New Zealand |
14 Aug 2017 - 29 Nov 2021 |
Individual | Hunter, Shannon |
Ohauiti Tauranga 3112 New Zealand |
09 May 2006 - 02 Sep 2021 |
Entity | New Zealand Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037527280 Company Number: 970683 |
30 Oct 2013 - 14 Aug 2017 | |
Entity | New Zealand Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037527280 Company Number: 970683 |
30 Oct 2013 - 14 Aug 2017 |
Lucas Findon - Director
Appointment date: 09 May 2006
Address: Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2023
Address: Ohauiti, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Sep 2015
Whenuapai Drop Zone Limited
Suite G3, 27 Gillies Avenue
Sandman Lodge Auckland Limited
Suite 203, 27 Gillies Avenue
Pinnacle Life Limited
Level 2, Gillies Avenue Office Park
Natural Source New Zealand Limited
Suite G1, 27 Gillies Avenue
Travoliday Limited
Suite G3, 27 Gillies Avenue
Nz Ev Conversions Limited
Suite G1, 27 Gillies Avenue