Bfgm Limited, a registered company, was registered on 21 Mar 2006. 9429034238028 is the NZBN it was issued. "Building, residential - renting or leasing - other than holiday" (business classification L671120) is how the company was classified. This company has been supervised by 4 directors: Deborah Marris - an active director whose contract began on 21 Mar 2006,
Barnaby James Marris Mcintosh - an inactive director whose contract began on 12 Oct 2016 and was terminated on 27 Sep 2018,
David Marris - an inactive director whose contract began on 02 Mar 2010 and was terminated on 11 Nov 2016,
David Patterson - an inactive director whose contract began on 21 Mar 2006 and was terminated on 02 Mar 2010.
Last updated on 07 Sep 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 9 Dublin Street, Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300 (category: postal, office).
Bfgm Limited had been using 22 John Dee Crescent, Red Beach, Whangaporoa, Auckland as their physical address until 25 Oct 2016.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 535592 shares) - Marris, Deborah - located at 9300, Queenstown, Queenstown.
Principal place of activity
9 Dublin Street, Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 22 John Dee Crescent, Red Beach, Whangaporoa, Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 25 Nov 2008 to 25 Oct 2016
Address #2: 22 John Dee Crescent, Red Beach, Whangaporoa, Auckland, 0932 New Zealand
Registered address used from 25 Nov 2008 to 25 Nov 2008
Address #3: 6 Palliser Road, Roseneath, Wellington
Registered & physical address used from 26 Jun 2007 to 25 Nov 2008
Address #4: 30 Upton Tce, Thorndon, Wellington
Physical & registered address used from 10 May 2006 to 26 Jun 2007
Address #5: 6 Palliser Road, Roseneath, Wellington
Physical & registered address used from 21 Mar 2006 to 10 May 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 535592
Annual return filing month: November
Financial report filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 02 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 535592 | |||
Individual | Marris, Deborah |
Queenstown Queenstown 9300 New Zealand |
21 Mar 2006 - |
Deborah Marris - Director
Appointment date: 21 Mar 2006
Address: Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Nov 2015
Barnaby James Marris Mcintosh - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Oct 2016
Termination date: 27 Sep 2018
Address: Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Mar 2017
David Marris - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Mar 2010
Termination date: 11 Nov 2016
Address: Red Beach, Whangaporoa, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Nov 2015
David Patterson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Mar 2006
Termination date: 02 Mar 2010
Address: Wadestown, Wellington, 6012 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Oct 2007
Straight Up Construction Nz Limited
3a Hallenstein Street
Swimming Otago Incorporated
C/o Colin Walker
Tjm Developments Limited
22 Dublin Street
Paramecium Limited
33 Suburb Street
Lob Investments Limited
33 Suburb Street
Ground Up Studio Limited
6 Panorama Terrace
Bickley Homes Limited
Mcculloch & Partners
Brothers Incorporated Limited
13 Camp Street
El Sol Limited
44 Stanley St
Orinocoa Limited
13 Manchester Place
Sprocket Holdings Limited
31b Edinburgh Drive
Westlight Limited
11-17 Church Street